10122 Cases | Kettering Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
18CVF03137 | DONNA LEFELD | 7/16/2018 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORP vs DONNA LEFELD | |||||||||
18CVE03011 | KYLE GROOMS | 7/13/2018 | |||||||
PROGRESSIVE SPECIALTY INSURANCE CO. vs KYLE GROOMS | |||||||||
18CVF02165 | STEPHEN E HARNESS | 7/13/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs STEPHEN E HARNESS | |||||||||
18CVF02650 | MATTHEW MAWBY | 7/13/2018 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs MATTHEW MAWBY | |||||||||
18CVI02794 | DAN REO | 7/11/2018 | |||||||
LINDA MCKELVEY vs DAN REO | |||||||||
18CVF02497 | JANET L COLLINS | 7/10/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. vs JANET L COLLINS | |||||||||
18CVG02580 | RAHNEIA SHAFEEK | 7/10/2018 | |||||||
PINETREE APARTMENTS LLC vs RAHNEIA SHAFEEK | |||||||||
18CVF02539 | ASHLEY N BEREDA | 7/10/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs ASHLEY N BEREDA | |||||||||
18CVF02357 | DENISE E KIRKLAND | 7/10/2018 | |||||||
DAY AIR CREDIT UNION, INC vs DENISE E KIRKLAND | |||||||||
18CVF02118 | PAUL BEHNKE | 7/10/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs PAUL BEHNKE | |||||||||
18CVF02025 | SHARON TAYLOR | 7/10/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs SHARON TAYLOR | |||||||||
17CVF03719 | DAVID ROHRBACK | 7/10/2018 | |||||||
MERRICK BANK CORPORATION vs DAVID ROHRBACK | |||||||||
18CVF02800 | JAMES R GRIDLEY | 7/9/2018 | |||||||
GUARDIAN FINANCE COMPANY vs JAMES R GRIDLEY | |||||||||
18CVE02520 | JAMES E LOWE | 7/6/2018 | |||||||
CINCINNATI INSURANCE CO. vs JAMES E LOWE | |||||||||
18CVF02043 | AARON CAMPBELL | 7/6/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. vs AARON CAMPBELL | |||||||||
18CVF02268 | CHERYL L TURNER | 7/6/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs CHERYL L TURNER | |||||||||
18CVF02272 | HOWARD C SOLGANIK | 7/6/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. vs HOWARD C SOLGANIK | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 308, 309, 310 ... 505, 506, 507 Next |