10106 Cases | Kettering Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
23CVF03792 | BRYON M. WELLS | 3/18/2024 | |||||||
DOVETREE APARTMENTS vs BRYON M. WELLS | |||||||||
23CVI03751 | STEPHANIE HARPER | 3/15/2024 | |||||||
COLDWELL BANKER HERITAGE vs STEPHANIE HARPER | |||||||||
24CVI02011 | DANNY ALLEY JR. | 3/15/2024 | |||||||
PEGGY HUNTER vs DANNY ALLEY Jr. | |||||||||
23CVF03605 | DEMITRIA BOSCARINO | 3/14/2024 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC vs DEMITRIA BOSCARINO | |||||||||
23CVF03846 | ELIZABETH R LITTLE | 3/14/2024 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO vs ELIZABETH R LITTLE | |||||||||
23CVF02585 | BRANDON JEWELL | 3/14/2024 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO vs BRANDON JEWELL | |||||||||
23CVI03014 | ASHAKI N DAUGHTERY | 3/14/2024 | |||||||
RONIKA I MARTIN vs ASHAKI N DAUGHTERY | |||||||||
23CVF03690 | NATASHA M MEZNI | 3/14/2024 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO vs NATASHA M MEZNI | |||||||||
23CVF04014 | AMANDA LEHMAN | 3/14/2024 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs AMANDA LEHMAN | |||||||||
23CVF02091 | JEFFREY M DEY | 3/14/2024 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO vs JEFFREY M DEY | |||||||||
23CVF04060 | CHRISTOPHER L BACK | 3/14/2024 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO, INC. vs CHRISTOPHER L BACK | |||||||||
23CVF02861 | MOLLIE S CULLEN | 3/13/2024 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO INC vs MOLLIE S CULLEN | |||||||||
23CVF03779 | MATTHEW S MACKENDRICK | 3/13/2024 | |||||||
SPRING OAKS CAPITAL SPV, LLC vs MATTHEW S MACKENDRICK | |||||||||
24CVF02041 | HOWARD TOMS | 3/13/2024 | |||||||
LENDMARK FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC vs HOWARD TOMS | |||||||||
23CVF03564 | KATIE LARAVIE | 3/12/2024 | |||||||
SYNCHRONY BANK vs KATIE LARAVIE | |||||||||
23CVF04107 | MARCIA L PABARUE | 3/11/2024 | |||||||
CITIBANK, N.A. vs MARCIA L PABARUE | |||||||||
23CVF03897 | SELISA ESTES | 3/11/2024 | |||||||
EAGLE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. vs SELISA ESTES | |||||||||
23CVF03769 | JEFFERY MONTGOMERY | 3/11/2024 | |||||||
VELOSITY INVESTMENTS, LLC vs JEFFERY MONTGOMERY | |||||||||
24CVF02036 | AMBER PARKISON | 3/11/2024 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO, INC. vs AMBER PARKISON | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3, 4, 5 ... 504, 505, 506 Next |