10136 Cases | Kettering Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
18CVF02811 | KHALISA J LOVELESS | 9/24/2018 | |||||||
XAVIER UNIVERSITY c/o RACHEL J MASON vs KHALISA J LOVELESS | |||||||||
18CVF02956 | DAVID A WIEDMEYER | 9/24/2018 | |||||||
YANKEE DENTAL vs DAVID A WIEDMEYER | |||||||||
18CVF02225 | CHRISTOPHER KELLEY | 9/24/2018 | |||||||
CORNERSTONE GOVERNOURS SQUARE LT vs CHRISTOPHER KELLEY | |||||||||
17CVF02724 | BETH HANES | 9/20/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs BETH HANES | |||||||||
18CVI03200 | TOBIAS GALL | 9/20/2018 | |||||||
MICHAEL REEB vs TOBIAS GALL | |||||||||
18CVF03166 | CHARLES BARNES | 9/19/2018 | |||||||
UNIVERSAL 1 CREDIT UNION vs CHARLES BARNES | |||||||||
18CVG03385 | DAVID BURNHAM STROOP | 9/19/2018 | |||||||
HI-FIVE PROPERTIES LLC vs DAVID BURNHAM STROOP | |||||||||
18CVF02691 | JESUS J VELASQUEZ | 9/18/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs JESUS J VELASQUEZ | |||||||||
18CVF03481 | BETHANY KMEID | 9/18/2018 | |||||||
VAUGHN GROUP LTD C/O RACHEL J MASON vs BETHANY KMEID | |||||||||
18CVF03141 | ELIZABETH MILLER | 9/18/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA vs ELIZABETH MILLER | |||||||||
18CVF02817 | GREGG S COUGHLIN | 9/18/2018 | |||||||
DAY AIR CREDIT UNION vs GREGG S COUGHLIN | |||||||||
18CVF02403 | CRAIG ANDERSON | 9/18/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs CRAIG ANDERSON | |||||||||
18CVF02325 | JOSHUA MCGIRR | 9/18/2018 | |||||||
RADIOLOGY PHYSICIANS INC vs JOSHUA MCGIRR | |||||||||
17CVF03696 | MICHAEL M QUATMAN | 9/17/2018 | |||||||
CITIBANK NA vs MICHAEL M QUATMAN | |||||||||
18CVF02572 | JASON L BROWN | 9/17/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs JASON L BROWN | |||||||||
18CVF02630 | PAT ASCH | 9/17/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. vs PAT ASCH | |||||||||
18CVF02904 | RAMON W KEY | 9/17/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. vs RAMON W KEY | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 292, 293, 294 ... 505, 506, 507 Next |