10122 Cases | Kettering Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
18CVF03276 | BRITTANY F KIRKPATRICK | 11/1/2018 | |||||||
STATE OF OHIO vs BRITTANY F KIRKPATRICK | |||||||||
18CVF03354 | KRISTINE MURO | 11/1/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs KRISTINE MURO | |||||||||
18CVF03264 | SARAH WILSON | 11/1/2018 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION vs SARAH WILSON | |||||||||
18CVE03225 | JAYVELL MCKINNEY | 10/31/2018 | |||||||
CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY vs JAYVELL MCKINNEY | |||||||||
18CVF02047 | MONICA MCGRELLIS | 10/31/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs MONICA MCGRELLIS | |||||||||
18CVF02389 | TODD WILSON | 10/31/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs TODD WILSON | |||||||||
18CVI03377 | HEATHER GRAY | 10/30/2018 | |||||||
KETTERING AMATEUR BASEBALL COMMI vs HEATHER GRAY | |||||||||
18CVF03361 | RODNEY W GEORGE | 10/30/2018 | |||||||
CBCS vs RODNEY W GEORGE | |||||||||
18CVF03349 | DIANE M BROWN | 10/30/2018 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs DIANE M BROWN | |||||||||
18CVF03109 | DONALD WALKER | 10/30/2018 | |||||||
CDL TRAINING SERVICES OF MISSOURI LLC vs DONALD WALKER | |||||||||
18CVF03096 | ROSEMARY ABBAN | 10/30/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. vs ROSEMARY ABBAN | |||||||||
17CVF03845 | CORDELL JOHNSON | 10/29/2018 | |||||||
EAN HOLDINGS, LLC vs CORDELL JOHNSON | |||||||||
18CVF02885 | ANTOINETTE DAVIS | 10/29/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs ANTOINETTE DAVIS | |||||||||
18CVF02961 | TARA CONTIE | 10/29/2018 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, L vs TARA CONTIE | |||||||||
18CVF03251 | HEATHER M ADAMS | 10/29/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs HEATHER M ADAMS | |||||||||
18CVF03267 | KELLY S BYRD | 10/29/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs KELLY S BYRD | |||||||||
18CVF03315 | LUZ JIMENEZ | 10/29/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs LUZ JIMENEZ | |||||||||
17CVE03633 | CULLIGAN DAYTON CULLIGAN OF DAYTON | 10/26/2018 | |||||||
CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY vs CULLIGAN DAYTON CULLIGAN OF DAYTON | |||||||||
18CVF02208 | HEATHER POLLITT | 10/26/2018 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORP c/o LEVY & ASSOC, LLC vs HEATHER POLLITT | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 287, 288, 289 ... 505, 506, 507 Next |