10122 Cases | Kettering Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
18CVF02893 | SHANNA RENNER | 11/7/2018 | |||||||
DAY AIR CREDIT UNION vs SHANNA RENNER | |||||||||
18CVF02953 | KIM L BUSH | 11/7/2018 | |||||||
YANKEE DENTAL vs KIM L BUSH | |||||||||
18CVF03136 | STEPHEN MILLER | 11/7/2018 | |||||||
ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC vs STEPHEN MILLER | |||||||||
18CVF03457 | CHELSEA GARDENS LLC | 11/7/2018 | |||||||
AGORA REALTY GROUP vs CHELSEA GARDENS LLC | |||||||||
17CVF03645 | JULITA R LUGARES | 11/7/2018 | |||||||
ONEMAIN FINANCIAL ISSUANCE vs JULITA R LUGARES | |||||||||
18CVF02910 | MEGHAN MUNDEY | 11/6/2018 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs MEGHAN MUNDEY | |||||||||
18CVF02926 | GUY FINCH | 11/6/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs GUY FINCH | |||||||||
18CVF02396 | ROBIN M GENGLER | 11/5/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs ROBIN M GENGLER | |||||||||
17CVG03494 | BRENNAN SCHMITTLE | 11/5/2018 | |||||||
JEFFREY W HEIL vs BRENNAN SCHMITTLE | |||||||||
18CVF03056 | CRAIG COCHRAN | 11/5/2018 | |||||||
DAY AIR CREDIT UNION vs CRAIG COCHRAN | |||||||||
18CVF02764 | JERRY MOSHER | 11/5/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK C/O LYONS, DOUGHTY & VELDHUIS P. vs JERRY MOSHER | |||||||||
18CVF02348 | LORA R FIFE | 11/5/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA vs LORA R FIFE | |||||||||
18CVF02264 | JASON L KENNISON | 11/5/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA vs JASON L KENNISON | |||||||||
18CVE02600 | DILLON C EDWARDS | 11/5/2018 | |||||||
LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY vs DILLON C EDWARDS | |||||||||
18CVF02751 | ZACHARY MCKINNEY | 11/2/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA IN OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING D vs ZACHARY MCKINNEY | |||||||||
18CVF03097 | STEVEN G JOLLAY | 11/2/2018 | |||||||
CBCS vs STEVEN G JOLLAY | |||||||||
17CVF03658 | AMANDA JENNINGS | 11/1/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs AMANDA JENNINGS | |||||||||
18CVF02086 | AARON FLOYD | 11/1/2018 | |||||||
RADIOLOGY PHYSICIANS INC C/O SLOVIN & ASSOCIATES CO. LPA vs AARON FLOYD | |||||||||
18CVF02382 | JARED SNAVELY | 11/1/2018 | |||||||
ONEMAIN FINANCIAL OF OHIO INC vs JARED SNAVELY | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 286, 287, 288 ... 505, 506, 507 Next |