10122 Cases | Kettering Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
18CVF03481 | BETHANY KMEID | 11/20/2018 | |||||||
VAUGHN GROUP LTD C/O RACHEL J MASON vs BETHANY KMEID | |||||||||
18CVE02287 | BRENDA STANSFIELD | 11/19/2018 | |||||||
STEPHEN BARNES vs BRENDA STANSFIELD | |||||||||
18CVF02806 | MICHELLE POWERS | 11/19/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs MICHELLE POWERS | |||||||||
18CVF03375 | EMILEE SMOOT | 11/19/2018 | |||||||
VAUGH GROUP LTD vs EMILEE SMOOT | |||||||||
18CVF03431 | NEAL SISK | 11/16/2018 | |||||||
ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC vs NEAL SISK | |||||||||
18CVF03849 | TERRENCE STEVENSON | 11/16/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs TERRENCE STEVENSON | |||||||||
18CVF03418 | PAMELA SCOTT | 11/15/2018 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK C/O ZWICKER & ASSOC, P.C. vs PAMELA SCOTT | |||||||||
18CVF03202 | DALE MASSIE | 11/15/2018 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs DALE MASSIE | |||||||||
18CVF02895 | CHERYL HALL | 11/15/2018 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, L vs CHERYL HALL | |||||||||
18CVF02809 | KIRSTIE WEISS | 11/15/2018 | |||||||
DAY AIR CREDIT UNION INC vs KIRSTIE WEISS | |||||||||
18CVF02653 | CYNTHIS RIEGEL | 11/15/2018 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs CYNTHIS RIEGEL | |||||||||
18CVF02747 | ROBERT COLLINS | 11/14/2018 | |||||||
U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION vs ROBERT COLLINS | |||||||||
18CVF03283 | MATTHEW P BAYNE | 11/14/2018 | |||||||
U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION vs MATTHEW P BAYNE | |||||||||
18CVF03357 | CHRISTOPHER N CONNER | 11/14/2018 | |||||||
IH CAREDIT UNION, INC vs CHRISTOPHER N CONNER | |||||||||
18CVF03387 | MARK FRANKLIN | 11/13/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs MARK FRANKLIN | |||||||||
17CVF03885 | PAMELA S HEUING | 11/9/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs PAMELA S HEUING | |||||||||
18CVF02689 | TUNDE C WELLS | 11/9/2018 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs TUNDE C WELLS | |||||||||
18CVF02901 | PATRICK PINGAULT | 11/9/2018 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs PATRICK PINGAULT | |||||||||
18CVF02905 | KORTNIE BREWER | 11/9/2018 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs KORTNIE BREWER | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 285, 286, 287 ... 505, 506, 507 Next |