10136 Cases | Kettering Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
18CVI03649 | HEATHER MILLWARD | 12/4/2018 | |||||||
COLDWELL BANKER HERITAGE vs HEATHER MILLWARD | |||||||||
18CVF02710 | ROBERT STIDHAM | 12/3/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC ASSIGNEE OF COMENITY BANK (MEIJE vs ROBERT STIDHAM | |||||||||
18CVF03098 | SHAUN OLDAKER | 12/3/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs SHAUN OLDAKER | |||||||||
18CVF02099 | STEPHEN J PARTENACH III | 11/30/2018 | |||||||
CITIBANK, N.A. vs STEPHEN J PARTENACH III | |||||||||
18CVF03301 | DUSTIN KINNETT | 11/30/2018 | |||||||
THOMAS R SCHIFF vs DUSTIN KINNETT | |||||||||
18CVF03465 | BINH T NGUYEN | 11/30/2018 | |||||||
CITIBANK, N.A. vs BINH T NGUYEN | |||||||||
18CVF03474 | JAVAN TERRELL | 11/30/2018 | |||||||
HS FINANCIAL GROUP LLC vs JAVAN TERRELL | |||||||||
18CVF03501 | MARILYN V RUETH | 11/30/2018 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I LLC BUYER vs MARILYN V RUETH | |||||||||
18CVF03587 | CHRISTINE L BURK | 11/30/2018 | |||||||
BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE vs CHRISTINE L BURK | |||||||||
18CVF02658 | ALEXANDREA DINOFA | 11/29/2018 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORP vs ALEXANDREA DINOFA | |||||||||
18CVF03392 | S & R AUTO INC STAT.AGT. RAED ALKHASAWNEH | 11/29/2018 | |||||||
FUSION CAPITAL C/O RACHEL J. MASON / ATTORNEY vs S & R AUTO INC STAT.AGT. RAED AL... | |||||||||
18CVF02140 | BRITTANY LEMASTER | 11/29/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC assignee of COMENITY BANK (MEIJE vs BRITTANY LEMASTER | |||||||||
18CVF02512 | BRIAN HICKS | 11/28/2018 | |||||||
DCWI LLC vs BRIAN HICKS | |||||||||
18CVF02673 | YVETTE YUHASX | 11/28/2018 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING, LLC vs YVETTE YUHASX | |||||||||
18CVI03245 | BRIAN HAMP | 11/28/2018 | |||||||
DANIEL MORGAN vs BRIAN HAMP | |||||||||
18CVI03395 | JONATHAN FLOYD | 11/28/2018 | |||||||
DAKOTA RAY ZIMMERMAN vs JONATHAN FLOYD | |||||||||
18CVI03397 | DAWN SMITH | 11/28/2018 | |||||||
VOSS CHEVROLET INC vs DAWN SMITH | |||||||||
18CVI03398 | CHRISTOPHER HARBAUGH | 11/28/2018 | |||||||
VOSS CHEVROLET INC vs CHRISTOPHER HARBAUGH | |||||||||
18CVI03399 | KENNETH WILLIAMS | 11/28/2018 | |||||||
VOSS CHEVROLET INC vs KENNETH WILLIAMS | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 284, 285, 286 ... 505, 506, 507 Next |