10058 Cases | Kettering Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
18CVF03300 | ANTHONY MATHEWS | 1/14/2019 | |||||||
THOMAS R SCHIFF vs ANTHONY MATHEWS | |||||||||
18CVF03145 | KELSEY WALLACE | 1/11/2019 | |||||||
COLONY OF KETTERING APTS vs KELSEY WALLACE | |||||||||
18CVF03415 | LEE J SAYLOR | 1/11/2019 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA C/O LYONS, DOUGHTY & VELDHUIS P. vs LEE J SAYLOR | |||||||||
18CVF03599 | SEAN MCGARRY | 1/11/2019 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs SEAN MCGARRY | |||||||||
18CVF03601 | WILLIAM HICKS | 1/11/2019 | |||||||
CACH LLC vs WILLIAM HICKS | |||||||||
18CVF03673 | HEATHER WARD | 1/11/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, L vs HEATHER WARD | |||||||||
18CVF03783 | BLAKE ROAN | 1/11/2019 | |||||||
BUCKEYE CREDIT SOLUTIONS LLC vs BLAKE ROAN | |||||||||
18CVF02736 | NAKEISHA HUGHES | 1/10/2019 | |||||||
CACH LLC vs NAKEISHA HUGHES | |||||||||
18CVF03204 | LINDA FINN | 1/10/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs LINDA FINN | |||||||||
18CVF03606 | TRISH HANSEN | 1/10/2019 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs TRISH HANSEN | |||||||||
18CVF02911 | ZACHARIAH R ADAMS | 1/9/2019 | |||||||
BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. c/o Levy & Associates, LLC vs ZACHARIAH R ADAMS | |||||||||
18CVF03289 | JULIE SUNDERLAND | 1/9/2019 | |||||||
N. A. R. INC C/O SLOVIN & ASSOCIATES CO. LPA vs JULIE SUNDERLAND | |||||||||
18CVF03189 | BECKY TURNER | 1/7/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs BECKY TURNER | |||||||||
18CVF03240 | BAMA NICOLE KEITH | 1/7/2019 | |||||||
COLONY OF KETTERING APTS vs BAMA NICOLE KEITH | |||||||||
18CVF03376 | PAULA BUCHHOLZ | 1/7/2019 | |||||||
THE FRANCISCAN AT ST. LEONARD vs PAULA BUCHHOLZ | |||||||||
18CVF03470 | PAMELLA BOWLING | 1/7/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs PAMELLA BOWLING | |||||||||
18CVF03696 | DAVID SWEITZER | 1/7/2019 | |||||||
HS FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC vs DAVID SWEITZER | |||||||||
18CVF03127 | ALLISON D TAYLOR | 1/4/2019 | |||||||
DNF ASSOCIATES LLC c/o LEVY AND ASSOC, LLC vs ALLISON D TAYLOR | |||||||||
18CVI03067 | JACQUELINE CLARK | 1/4/2019 | |||||||
RONALD SUPRENANT vs JACQUELINE CLARK | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 276, 277, 278 ... 501, 502, 503 Next |