10106 Cases | Kettering Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
18CVF04008 | MERRILY NOEL | 3/6/2019 | |||||||
BANK OF AMERICA N.A. C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES LLC vs MERRILY NOEL | |||||||||
18CVF02827 | COLDBEAR LOGISTICS, LLC C/O CORPORATION SRVCS CO | 3/5/2019 | |||||||
ARA EXPRESS, INC vs COLDBEAR LOGISTICS, LLC C/O CORPORATION SRVCS CO | |||||||||
18CVF03549 | JOSEPH LAW | 3/5/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs JOSEPH LAW | |||||||||
18CVF03865 | EVA COTTEN | 3/4/2019 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK C/O LYONS, DOUGHTY & VELDHUIS P. vs EVA COTTEN | |||||||||
18CVG02944 | KENNETH BOZEMAN | 3/4/2019 | |||||||
G & I VI WASHINGTON PARK, LLC vs KENNETH BOZEMAN | |||||||||
18CVF03536 | NATHAN LAZZARINE | 3/1/2019 | |||||||
COLONY OF KETTERING, LLC vs NATHAN LAZZARINE | |||||||||
18CVI03713 | DIEUDONNE NSABIMANA | 3/1/2019 | |||||||
DIEUDONNE BIZUMUREMYI vs DIEUDONNE NSABIMANA | |||||||||
18CVF03523 | JIMMY HOSHUE | 2/26/2019 | |||||||
SECOND ROUND SUB, LLC vs JIMMY HOSHUE | |||||||||
18CVF03849 | TERRENCE STEVENSON | 2/26/2019 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs TERRENCE STEVENSON | |||||||||
18CVF02614 | CLIFFORD WOOLFORK | 2/26/2019 | |||||||
HS FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC vs CLIFFORD WOOLFORK | |||||||||
18CVF02606 | RICHARD WALTON | 2/26/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs RICHARD WALTON | |||||||||
18CVF02237 | JENNIFER STOGSDILL | 2/26/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs JENNIFER STOGSDILL | |||||||||
18CVF02931 | THOMAS KRUG | 2/25/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs THOMAS KRUG | |||||||||
18CVF03273 | PHYLLIS J TRUSSELL | 2/25/2019 | |||||||
TD BANK USA, N.A. SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TARGET vs PHYLLIS J TRUSSELL | |||||||||
18CVF03463 | CRAIG BOWLING | 2/25/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, L vs CRAIG BOWLING | |||||||||
18CVF03529 | MELISSA RANKIN | 2/25/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, L vs MELISSA RANKIN | |||||||||
18CVF03588 | DARIN SNYDER | 2/25/2019 | |||||||
DNF ASSOCIATES LLC vs DARIN SNYDER | |||||||||
18CVF03671 | CHRISTINE KEITH | 2/25/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, L vs CHRISTINE KEITH | |||||||||
18CVF03679 | CHRISTINE KEITH | 2/25/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs CHRISTINE KEITH | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 271, 272, 273 ... 504, 505, 506 Next |