10058 Cases | Kettering Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
19CVF02102 | KATHLEEN K MULHERN | 3/12/2019 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs KATHLEEN K MULHERN | |||||||||
18CVF03450 | LAUREN A HENDERSON | 3/11/2019 | |||||||
JHPDE FINANCE I LLC vs LAUREN A HENDERSON | |||||||||
18CVF03711 | MICHAEL S PENDELL | 3/11/2019 | |||||||
UNIVERSAL 1 CREDIT UNION vs MICHAEL S PENDELL | |||||||||
18CVF03719 | ANGEL J MOHLER | 3/11/2019 | |||||||
UNIVERSAL 1 CREDIT UNION INC vs ANGEL J MOHLER | |||||||||
18CVF04022 | DAVID W QUALLS | 3/11/2019 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs DAVID W QUALLS | |||||||||
18CVF04027 | MANFRED W JAHNKE | 3/11/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, L vs MANFRED W JAHNKE | |||||||||
18CVF02527 | CATHERINE MILLER | 3/8/2019 | |||||||
CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC vs CATHERINE MILLER | |||||||||
18CVF03990 | KRYSTAL N SALMAN | 3/8/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs KRYSTAL N SALMAN | |||||||||
19CVF02283 | KELLI L MOHR | 3/8/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LL vs KELLI L MOHR | |||||||||
18CVF03722 | MARY TURLEY | 3/7/2019 | |||||||
SYNCHRONY BANK vs MARY TURLEY | |||||||||
18CVF02912 | NATALIE M MOGLE | 3/6/2019 | |||||||
CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC vs NATALIE M MOGLE | |||||||||
18CVF04008 | MERRILY NOEL | 3/6/2019 | |||||||
BANK OF AMERICA N.A. C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES LLC vs MERRILY NOEL | |||||||||
18CVF03755 | RACHAEL D AYDELOTT | 3/6/2019 | |||||||
CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC vs RACHAEL D AYDELOTT | |||||||||
18CVF02827 | COLDBEAR LOGISTICS, LLC C/O CORPORATION SRVCS CO | 3/5/2019 | |||||||
ARA EXPRESS, INC vs COLDBEAR LOGISTICS, LLC C/O CORPORATION SRVCS CO | |||||||||
18CVF03549 | JOSEPH LAW | 3/5/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs JOSEPH LAW | |||||||||
18CVF03865 | EVA COTTEN | 3/4/2019 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK C/O LYONS, DOUGHTY & VELDHUIS P. vs EVA COTTEN | |||||||||
18CVG02944 | KENNETH BOZEMAN | 3/4/2019 | |||||||
G & I VI WASHINGTON PARK, LLC vs KENNETH BOZEMAN | |||||||||
18CVF03536 | NATHAN LAZZARINE | 3/1/2019 | |||||||
COLONY OF KETTERING, LLC vs NATHAN LAZZARINE | |||||||||
18CVI03713 | DIEUDONNE NSABIMANA | 3/1/2019 | |||||||
DIEUDONNE BIZUMUREMYI vs DIEUDONNE NSABIMANA | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 268, 269, 270 ... 501, 502, 503 Next |