10058 Cases | Kettering Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
18CVF03578 | JOSEPH WILLIAMS | 3/22/2019 | |||||||
FOX HUNT OWNER LLC vs JOSEPH WILLIAMS | |||||||||
18CVF02981 | ALA HAMAD | 3/21/2019 | |||||||
CBCS vs ALA HAMAD | |||||||||
19CVF02048 | ANTOWAN FOSTER | 3/21/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs ANTOWAN FOSTER | |||||||||
18CVE03720 | MAKAYLA R JENKINS | 3/19/2019 | |||||||
WEST BEND MUTUAL INS. CO vs MAKAYLA R JENKINS | |||||||||
18CVF04044 | NORMAN PROULX JR. | 3/19/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, L vs NORMAN PROULX Jr. | |||||||||
18CVF04052 | THOMAS D BOWLING | 3/19/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, L vs THOMAS D BOWLING | |||||||||
19CVF02014 | DEBORAH MECKES | 3/19/2019 | |||||||
AUTOVEST LLC vs DEBORAH MECKES | |||||||||
19CVI02173 | DWAYNE CARL JR. | 3/19/2019 | |||||||
DERRICK HAMM vs DWAYNE CARL Jr. | |||||||||
18CVF03891 | ANDREW J KOORS | 3/18/2019 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO, INC vs ANDREW J KOORS | |||||||||
19CVF02321 | ERICA TILLEY | 3/18/2019 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK C/O LYONS, DOUGHTY & VELDHUIS P. vs ERICA TILLEY | |||||||||
18CVF03901 | BROOKE AMOS | 3/18/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LL vs BROOKE AMOS | |||||||||
18CVF03579 | SHALAMARR M EVANS | 3/18/2019 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO INC vs SHALAMARR M EVANS | |||||||||
18CVF03503 | DANIELLE PAIGE WILHELM | 3/18/2019 | |||||||
WESTERN RESERVE MUTUAL CASUALTY vs DANIELLE PAIGE WILHELM | |||||||||
18CVF03580 | CORY N SMITH | 3/14/2019 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO INC vs CORY N SMITH | |||||||||
18CVF03635 | WILLIAM J MORRIS | 3/14/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LL vs WILLIAM J MORRIS | |||||||||
18CVF03853 | DANIEL MATHENEY | 3/14/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs DANIEL MATHENEY | |||||||||
19CVF02156 | JAIME L FAULKNER | 3/14/2019 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK C/O LYONS, DOUGHTY & VELDHUIS P. vs JAIME L FAULKNER | |||||||||
18CVF03512 | NEIL COLLINS | 3/12/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs NEIL COLLINS | |||||||||
18CVF03624 | JAMES C JURICH | 3/12/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, L vs JAMES C JURICH | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 267, 268, 269 ... 501, 502, 503 Next |