10122 Cases | Kettering Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
18CVF03999 | RACHEL ALLEN | 4/16/2019 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs RACHEL ALLEN | |||||||||
19CVF02130 | CHRISTOPHER L RETTIG | 4/16/2019 | |||||||
MARINER FINANCE LLC vs CHRISTOPHER L RETTIG | |||||||||
18CVI03910 | DAVICCIA D LANDERS | 4/16/2019 | |||||||
BROWNIES INDEPENDENT TRANSMISSIO vs DAVICCIA D LANDERS | |||||||||
19CVI02314 | ANTWAN J WOODS SR. | 4/16/2019 | |||||||
TRACY A FREEMAN vs ANTWAN J WOODS Sr. | |||||||||
18CVF03927 | JACQUELINE WYSONG | 4/16/2019 | |||||||
ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC AS SERVICER FOR WILMINGTON TRUST vs JACQUELINE WYSONG | |||||||||
19CVF02015 | PAUL COMBS | 4/15/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs PAUL COMBS | |||||||||
19CVF02407 | SILVIA J RAMOS-RATLIFF | 4/15/2019 | |||||||
US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION vs SILVIA J RAMOS-RATLIFF | |||||||||
19CVI02026 | CASEY RENTAL PROPERTIES | 4/15/2019 | |||||||
STACEY GOSSETT vs CASEY RENTAL PROPERTIES | |||||||||
19CVF02483 | JONATHAN GLEASON | 4/12/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs JONATHAN GLEASON | |||||||||
18CVF03686 | WILSON II HARRIS | 4/12/2019 | |||||||
SHERRETS LAW OFFICES, LLC vs WILSON II HARRIS | |||||||||
18CVF02484 | DEBORAH A SANDSTROM | 4/12/2019 | |||||||
BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE vs DEBORAH A SANDSTROM | |||||||||
18CVF02634 | AMBER KING | 4/11/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, L vs AMBER KING | |||||||||
18CVF03411 | SHEILA LEE | 4/11/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs SHEILA LEE | |||||||||
18CVF03595 | DELENA M AUNGST | 4/11/2019 | |||||||
DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK vs DELENA M AUNGST | |||||||||
19CVF02097 | BRADLEY HILINSKI | 4/11/2019 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs BRADLEY HILINSKI | |||||||||
18CVE03902 | PATRICK HYDEN | 4/10/2019 | |||||||
CALIFORNIA CASUALTY INDEMNITY EXCHANGE vs PATRICK HYDEN | |||||||||
18CVF03118 | ROSIE PLAYER | 4/10/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs ROSIE PLAYER | |||||||||
18CVF03410 | LINDSEY UNDERWOOD | 4/10/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs LINDSEY UNDERWOOD | |||||||||
18CVF03446 | JEREMY HARVEY | 4/10/2019 | |||||||
FOX HUNT APARTMENTS vs JEREMY HARVEY | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 265, 266, 267 ... 505, 506, 507 Next |