10161 Cases | Kettering Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
19CVF02467 | LOREN BROWN | 5/3/2019 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs LOREN BROWN | |||||||||
19CVI02418 | CHRISTOPHER KREMER | 5/1/2019 | |||||||
ANN M BOYD vs CHRISTOPHER KREMER | |||||||||
18CVF03254 | BRIAN M FURDERER | 4/30/2019 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK vs BRIAN M FURDERER | |||||||||
18CVF03866 | JACQUELINE M BURNS | 4/30/2019 | |||||||
BANK OF AMERICA N.A. C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES LLC vs JACQUELINE M BURNS | |||||||||
19CVF02132 | DAVID STOEHR | 4/30/2019 | |||||||
AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK vs DAVID STOEHR | |||||||||
19CVF02350 | MISTY TOOKER | 4/30/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs MISTY TOOKER | |||||||||
19CVF02495 | KAREN FORTNER | 4/30/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LL vs KAREN FORTNER | |||||||||
19CVF02519 | KATHY SEALS | 4/30/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LL vs KATHY SEALS | |||||||||
19CVF02553 | BETTY LOU POLLITT | 4/30/2019 | |||||||
HS FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC vs BETTY LOU POLLITT | |||||||||
19CVI02265 | DONALD E WASHINGTON | 4/30/2019 | |||||||
KOHLER FOODS INC vs DONALD E WASHINGTON | |||||||||
19CVF02131 | ZACHERY KING | 4/29/2019 | |||||||
MARINER FINANCE LLC vs ZACHERY KING | |||||||||
19CVF02165 | STACEY ALSPAUGH | 4/29/2019 | |||||||
DAY AIR CREDIT UNION INC vs STACEY ALSPAUGH | |||||||||
18CVF03317 | TAMMY JETT | 4/26/2019 | |||||||
CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC vs TAMMY JETT | |||||||||
18CVF03896 | MARY A TAYLOR | 4/26/2019 | |||||||
TD BANK USA, N.A. SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO TARGET vs MARY A TAYLOR | |||||||||
19CVF02272 | KEN MEYER | 4/26/2019 | |||||||
ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC AS SERVICER FOR WILMINGTON TRUST vs KEN MEYER | |||||||||
19CVF02304 | TERESA WINKLER | 4/26/2019 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION vs TERESA WINKLER | |||||||||
18CVF02742 | JONATHAN DAS | 4/25/2019 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs JONATHAN DAS | |||||||||
18CVF03480 | RICHARD P WINANS | 4/25/2019 | |||||||
ALLY FINANCIAL INC vs RICHARD P WINANS | |||||||||
18CVF03540 | JOSEPH ANSON III | 4/25/2019 | |||||||
SECOND ROUND SUB, LLC vs JOSEPH ANSON III | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 264, 265, 266 ... 507, 508, 509 Next |