10122 Cases | Kettering Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
18CVF03758 | ERIN L FRANKLIN | 4/25/2019 | |||||||
CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC vs ERIN L FRANKLIN | |||||||||
18CVF03996 | JENNIFER COTTRILL | 4/25/2019 | |||||||
CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC vs JENNIFER COTTRILL | |||||||||
19CVF02416 | KATHERINE ROY | 4/25/2019 | |||||||
ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC AS SERVICER FOR WILMINGTON TRUST vs KATHERINE ROY | |||||||||
18CVF03716 | TAMMY JETT | 4/25/2019 | |||||||
SECOND ROUND SUB, LLC vs TAMMY JETT | |||||||||
19CVF02159 | CHRISTOPHER HERMAN | 4/24/2019 | |||||||
C&F FINANCE COMPANY vs CHRISTOPHER HERMAN | |||||||||
18CVG03495 | WENDY MCGUIRE | 4/24/2019 | |||||||
COLONY OF KETTERING APTS PLK COMMUNITIES LLC vs WENDY MCGUIRE | |||||||||
19CVF02107 | BRANDON STORER | 4/24/2019 | |||||||
NC DEVELOPMENT GROUP vs BRANDON STORER | |||||||||
19CVF02092 | JOHN TYLER | 4/24/2019 | |||||||
BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. c/o Levy & Associates, LLC vs JOHN TYLER | |||||||||
18CVF04041 | CHARLES D SHEPARD 2 | 4/24/2019 | |||||||
US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION vs CHARLES D SHEPARD 2 | |||||||||
18CVF03769 | JAMES WRIGHT | 4/24/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LL vs JAMES WRIGHT | |||||||||
18CVF03161 | TONICIA WILSON | 4/24/2019 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs TONICIA WILSON | |||||||||
18CVE03917 | NATALIE WALTERS | 4/24/2019 | |||||||
PROGRESSIVE SPECIALTY INSURANCE vs NATALIE WALTERS | |||||||||
18CVF03322 | BILLY R MCLEOD | 4/23/2019 | |||||||
PROGRESSIVE SPECIALTY INSURANCE vs BILLY R MCLEOD | |||||||||
18CVF03518 | KELLI MILLER | 4/23/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs KELLI MILLER | |||||||||
18CVF03780 | TAMMY LOGSDON | 4/23/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, L vs TAMMY LOGSDON | |||||||||
18CVF03814 | KINLEY SMITH | 4/23/2019 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs KINLEY SMITH | |||||||||
19CVF02139 | CAREN CASHELL | 4/23/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LL vs CAREN CASHELL | |||||||||
19CVF02140 | AMY SWISHER | 4/22/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs AMY SWISHER | |||||||||
18CVF02969 | PAM HENDERSON | 4/19/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, L vs PAM HENDERSON | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 263, 264, 265 ... 505, 506, 507 Next |