10106 Cases | Kettering Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
19CVF02342 | ANNE CAVANAGH | 5/14/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs ANNE CAVANAGH | |||||||||
18CVF04020 | HOLLY CAROLL | 5/13/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, L vs HOLLY CAROLL | |||||||||
18CVF04030 | KATHLEEN F CHAMBERS | 5/10/2019 | |||||||
BANK OF AMERICA N.A. C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES LLC vs KATHLEEN F CHAMBERS | |||||||||
19CVF02068 | KEVIN S WAGNER | 5/10/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs KEVIN S WAGNER | |||||||||
19CVF02216 | PATRICIA A UNDERWOOD | 5/10/2019 | |||||||
BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. vs PATRICIA A UNDERWOOD | |||||||||
19CVF02278 | JEFFRY S UNDERWOOD | 5/10/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, L vs JEFFRY S UNDERWOOD | |||||||||
19CVI02004 | BILLY KELCH | 5/10/2019 | |||||||
BRENDA ORTEZ vs BILLY KELCH | |||||||||
19CVF02346 | TONI MINDLIN | 5/8/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs TONI MINDLIN | |||||||||
19CVG02720 | MAYGAN R WARD | 5/8/2019 | |||||||
VIC GREEN REALTY AGENT FOR ROYAL OAK V FAMILY LIM vs MAYGAN R WARD | |||||||||
18CVF04014 | LINDA A YOUNG | 5/7/2019 | |||||||
PATHFINDER REALTY INC vs LINDA A YOUNG | |||||||||
19CVF02567 | REBECCA L BROWN | 5/7/2019 | |||||||
U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION vs REBECCA L BROWN | |||||||||
18CVF04038 | RACHEL SPURLING | 5/7/2019 | |||||||
BUCKEYE CREDIT SOLUTIONS L.L.C. vs RACHEL SPURLING | |||||||||
18CVF03334 | PAMELA MEYERS | 5/7/2019 | |||||||
CORNERSTONE-KETTERING PROPERTIES BEAVER RIDGE RUN APARTMENTS vs PAMELA MEYERS | |||||||||
18CVF03911 | GARY GATZULIS | 5/6/2019 | |||||||
US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION vs GARY GATZULIS | |||||||||
18CVF03976 | SHERRI VOLKERT | 5/6/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs SHERRI VOLKERT | |||||||||
19CVF02206 | CARLA REED | 5/6/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LL vs CARLA REED | |||||||||
19CVF02300 | KEVIN BRAGG | 5/6/2019 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs KEVIN BRAGG | |||||||||
18CVF03234 | BENJAMIN JOHNSON | 5/3/2019 | |||||||
CHIMNEYS OF OAK CREEK APTS vs BENJAMIN JOHNSON | |||||||||
18CVF03802 | MELISSA KELLER | 5/3/2019 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. vs MELISSA KELLER | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 260, 261, 262 ... 504, 505, 506 Next |