10106 Cases | Kettering Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
18CVI04031 | JUSTIN HOVAN | 5/23/2019 | |||||||
GREG SIPE vs JUSTIN HOVAN | |||||||||
19CVG02629 | JOHN RADICH | 5/23/2019 | |||||||
ELEVATE SPORTS TRAINING, LLC vs JOHN RADICH | |||||||||
18CVF03869 | NICOLE HAWKINS | 5/22/2019 | |||||||
ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC vs NICOLE HAWKINS | |||||||||
19CVF02481 | SHARON NAUGLE | 5/22/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs SHARON NAUGLE | |||||||||
19CVF02603 | HEATHER SPRINKLES | 5/22/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs HEATHER SPRINKLES | |||||||||
19CVF02643 | DARRELL R DENTON | 5/22/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, L vs DARRELL R DENTON | |||||||||
19CVF02022 | RANDALL K NETHERTON | 5/21/2019 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO INC vs RANDALL K NETHERTON | |||||||||
19CVF02024 | JENNIFER A LEMMON | 5/21/2019 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO INC vs JENNIFER A LEMMON | |||||||||
18CVF03920 | ROBERT J THACKER JR. | 5/21/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs ROBERT J THACKER Jr. | |||||||||
18CVF03892 | CHRISTOPHER A PHILLIPS | 5/21/2019 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO INC vs CHRISTOPHER A PHILLIPS | |||||||||
18CVF03888 | RYAN GROOMS | 5/21/2019 | |||||||
VELOCITY INVESTMENTS LLC vs RYAN GROOMS | |||||||||
18CVF03190 | TINA LAKE | 5/21/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs TINA LAKE | |||||||||
17CVF02757 | KERIANNE PENQUITE | 5/20/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs KERIANNE PENQUITE | |||||||||
18CVF03627 | STEPHEN ROSE | 5/20/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs STEPHEN ROSE | |||||||||
18CVF03445 | SANDRA BUTTERY | 5/17/2019 | |||||||
FOX HUNT APARTMENTS vs SANDRA BUTTERY | |||||||||
18CVF03530 | JERRY M MOSHER JR. | 5/17/2019 | |||||||
TD BANK USA, N.A. AS SUCCESSOR IN INT. TO TARGET N vs JERRY M MOSHER Jr. | |||||||||
19CVF02031 | TODD R FUGATE | 5/17/2019 | |||||||
TD BANK USA, N.A. vs TODD R FUGATE | |||||||||
19CVF02099 | JAMES TORELLO | 5/17/2019 | |||||||
CORNERSTONE-GOVERNOURS SQUARE, L vs JAMES TORELLO | |||||||||
19CVF02202 | ANGELA CURTIS | 5/17/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, L vs ANGELA CURTIS | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 258, 259, 260 ... 504, 505, 506 Next |