Daily Law Journal
5368 Cases | Kettering Municipal Judgements
Case Number Defendant Date
15CVF02797 KIMBERLY HARDIE 1/6/2016
GREENMONT MUTUAL HOUSING CORP vs KIMBERLY HARDIE
15CVF03020 RICHARD HOYT 1/5/2016
CBCS vs RICHARD HOYT
15CVF02916 AMY M COLE 1/5/2016
CITY OF KETTERING vs AMY M COLE
15CVF02313 KRISTEN VANCE 12/31/2015
WESTERN RESERVE MUTUAL CASUALTY vs KRISTEN VANCE
15CVF02654 DONALD KING 12/29/2015
SUNDANCE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT vs DONALD KING
15CVF02819 RICHARD KIMBLE 12/29/2015
JOSEPH CASHMAN vs RICHARD KIMBLE
15CVF02588 CAROLE L SHOCKEY 12/28/2015
BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. vs CAROLE L SHOCKEY
15CVF02501 DAWN WOODALL 12/28/2015
CACH, LLC vs DAWN WOODALL

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... 250, 251, 252 ... 267, 268, 269  Next