10122 Cases | Kettering Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
19CVI02010 | AUDRA GIBSON | 7/18/2019 | |||||||
ROGER O JOHNSON vs AUDRA GIBSON | |||||||||
19CVF02694 | SHERRI SHEFFIELD | 7/18/2019 | |||||||
ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC vs SHERRI SHEFFIELD | |||||||||
18CVF03409 | DIANE BROWN | 7/17/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs DIANE BROWN | |||||||||
19CVF02203 | KRISTY N BOWERMASTER | 7/17/2019 | |||||||
ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC AS SERVICER FOR WELLS FARGO vs KRISTY N BOWERMASTER | |||||||||
19CVF02285 | MONICA BEAL | 7/17/2019 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs MONICA BEAL | |||||||||
19CVF02520 | MARY A WOODWARD | 7/17/2019 | |||||||
MARINER FINANCE, LLC vs MARY A WOODWARD | |||||||||
19CVF02853 | RACHEL R EMERSON | 7/17/2019 | |||||||
CBCS vs RACHEL R EMERSON | |||||||||
19CVF03005 | MARTHA L GREER | 7/17/2019 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC vs MARTHA L GREER | |||||||||
19CVF02522 | KEVIN M PEACOCK | 7/16/2019 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO, INC vs KEVIN M PEACOCK | |||||||||
19CVJ00001 | RICHARD B PIPES | 7/16/2019 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I LLC C/O LEVY AND ASSOCIATES vs RICHARD B PIPES | |||||||||
19CVF02774 | STACY BOWLING | 7/16/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs STACY BOWLING | |||||||||
19CVF02764 | LINDA A JOHNSON | 7/16/2019 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs LINDA A JOHNSON | |||||||||
19CVF02734 | GERALDINE TAYLOR | 7/16/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs GERALDINE TAYLOR | |||||||||
19CVF02354 | DEBRA CAMPBELL | 7/16/2019 | |||||||
VELOCITY INVESTMENTS LLC LENDINGCLUB CORP. / WEBBANK vs DEBRA CAMPBELL | |||||||||
18CVF03002 | HEATHER M BOOTH | 7/16/2019 | |||||||
1ST FINANCIAL BANK USA vs HEATHER M BOOTH | |||||||||
19CVF02613 | ELIZABETH A GABBARD | 7/15/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LL vs ELIZABETH A GABBARD | |||||||||
19CVF02966 | JAMIE GLEASON | 7/15/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs JAMIE GLEASON | |||||||||
19CVF02592 | MICHEL BUXTON | 7/12/2019 | |||||||
CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC vs MICHEL BUXTON | |||||||||
19CVF02751 | BRIAN C SCHOMMER | 7/12/2019 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs BRIAN C SCHOMMER | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 249, 250, 251 ... 505, 506, 507 Next |