10058 Cases | Kettering Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
19CVF03036 | REBA L WHITAKER | 7/25/2019 | |||||||
CITIBANK NA vs REBA L WHITAKER | |||||||||
19CVF02415 | CHRISTOPHER WHATMAN | 7/24/2019 | |||||||
BANK OF AMERICA N.A. vs CHRISTOPHER WHATMAN | |||||||||
19CVF02627 | RICHARD WEBB | 7/24/2019 | |||||||
THE OAKS OF WEST KETTERING vs RICHARD WEBB | |||||||||
19CVF02782 | PATRICIA A UNDERWOOD | 7/23/2019 | |||||||
BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE vs PATRICIA A UNDERWOOD | |||||||||
19CVF02586 | VICTOR ROONEY | 7/23/2019 | |||||||
GLENN J. JIVIDEN, JR., D.D.S. IN vs VICTOR ROONEY | |||||||||
19CVF02516 | PAIGE RUNYON | 7/23/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs PAIGE RUNYON | |||||||||
19CVF02400 | MICHAEL SAUM | 7/23/2019 | |||||||
ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC vs MICHAEL SAUM | |||||||||
19CVF02388 | CHARLENE YATES | 7/23/2019 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO INC vs CHARLENE YATES | |||||||||
19CVF02309 | NATHAN LANE | 7/23/2019 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs NATHAN LANE | |||||||||
19CVF02166 | CARMILLE AKANDE | 7/23/2019 | |||||||
DAY AIR CREDIT UNION INC vs CARMILLE AKANDE | |||||||||
19CVF02072 | KIMBERLY BOURDON | 7/23/2019 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs KIMBERLY BOURDON | |||||||||
19CVF02069 | TRICIA DILLAVOU | 7/22/2019 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs TRICIA DILLAVOU | |||||||||
18CVF02686 | NICHOLAS ECHCAROFF | 7/18/2019 | |||||||
ALLY FINANCIAL INC vs NICHOLAS ECHCAROFF | |||||||||
19CVF02367 | PATRICK TAYLOR | 7/18/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LL vs PATRICK TAYLOR | |||||||||
19CVF02428 | DANIELLE M PARRETT | 7/18/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LL vs DANIELLE M PARRETT | |||||||||
19CVF02694 | SHERRI SHEFFIELD | 7/18/2019 | |||||||
ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC vs SHERRI SHEFFIELD | |||||||||
19CVI02010 | AUDRA GIBSON | 7/18/2019 | |||||||
ROGER O JOHNSON vs AUDRA GIBSON | |||||||||
18CVF03409 | DIANE BROWN | 7/17/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs DIANE BROWN | |||||||||
19CVF02203 | KRISTY N BOWERMASTER | 7/17/2019 | |||||||
ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC AS SERVICER FOR WELLS FARGO vs KRISTY N BOWERMASTER | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 245, 246, 247 ... 501, 502, 503 Next |