10122 Cases | Kettering Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
19CVG02616 | CORTNEY CAULLEY | 8/29/2019 | |||||||
CORNERSTONE-GOVERNOURS SQ. LTD vs CORTNEY CAULLEY | |||||||||
19CVF03112 | LINDA D DENNIS | 8/29/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LL vs LINDA D DENNIS | |||||||||
19CVF03151 | KENNETH R ELLINGSON | 8/28/2019 | |||||||
CBCS vs KENNETH R ELLINGSON | |||||||||
19CVF03230 | JAMI OBRIEN | 8/28/2019 | |||||||
GREATER DAYTON SURGERY CENTER LL vs JAMI OBRIEN | |||||||||
19CVF02817 | KIMBERLY RANDALL | 8/27/2019 | |||||||
FORSYTHE FINANCE, LLC vs KIMBERLY RANDALL | |||||||||
19CVF03065 | ELAINA DIREITO | 8/27/2019 | |||||||
SYNCHRONY BANK vs ELAINA DIREITO | |||||||||
19CVF03113 | DEANNA R MUNDHENK | 8/27/2019 | |||||||
GRANT S DONALDSON vs DEANNA R MUNDHENK | |||||||||
19CVF03134 | BILLIE RYBKA | 8/26/2019 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORP c/o LEVY & ASSOC, LLC vs BILLIE RYBKA | |||||||||
19CVF03164 | BAISTAR MECHANICAL INC DBA BAISTAR INC | 8/26/2019 | |||||||
CHAPEL ELECTRIC CO., LLC vs BAISTAR MECHANICAL INC DBA BAISTAR INC | |||||||||
19CVF03152 | ROBERT BANKS | 8/26/2019 | |||||||
ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC AS SERVICER FOR WELLS FARGO vs ROBERT BANKS | |||||||||
19CVF02981 | ELMER GAITAN | 8/26/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs ELMER GAITAN | |||||||||
19CVF02626 | ANGELA DASNER | 8/26/2019 | |||||||
AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK vs ANGELA DASNER | |||||||||
19CVF02163 | ALEXANDER BALDRIDGE | 8/26/2019 | |||||||
DNF ASSOCIATES LLC c/o LEVY AND ASSOC, LLC vs ALEXANDER BALDRIDGE | |||||||||
19CVF02328 | GARY OSBORN | 8/23/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs GARY OSBORN | |||||||||
19CVF02490 | MICHELLE M HAMPTON | 8/23/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs MICHELLE M HAMPTON | |||||||||
19CVF02611 | MADELINE R CLARK | 8/23/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, L vs MADELINE R CLARK | |||||||||
19CVF02718 | STEVEN JOHNSON | 8/23/2019 | |||||||
ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC vs STEVEN JOHNSON | |||||||||
19CVF02725 | CHERYL TURNER | 8/23/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, L vs CHERYL TURNER | |||||||||
19CVF02783 | GREGORY S RICHARDS | 8/23/2019 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO, INC vs GREGORY S RICHARDS | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 239, 240, 241 ... 505, 506, 507 Next |