10058 Cases | Kettering Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
19CVF02383 | JOHNNY D KNIGHT | 9/9/2019 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK C/O ZWICKER & ASSOC, P.C. vs JOHNNY D KNIGHT | |||||||||
19CVF02420 | VICTORIA STAMPS | 9/9/2019 | |||||||
SECOND ROUND SUB LLC vs VICTORIA STAMPS | |||||||||
19CVF02507 | MIRANDA PITTMAN | 9/9/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs MIRANDA PITTMAN | |||||||||
19CVF03188 | JAMEE OVERBAY | 9/9/2019 | |||||||
DNF ASSOCIATES LLC vs JAMEE OVERBAY | |||||||||
19CVF02177 | BEVERLY MCKINLEY | 9/9/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs BEVERLY MCKINLEY | |||||||||
19CVF02753 | SHARON MARLOW | 9/6/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, L vs SHARON MARLOW | |||||||||
19CVF03269 | KATHERINE RODRIGUEZ | 9/6/2019 | |||||||
PCA ACQUISITIONS V, LLC C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES, LLC vs KATHERINE RODRIGUEZ | |||||||||
19CVF03341 | MADELINE S METZGER | 9/6/2019 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs MADELINE S METZGER | |||||||||
19CVF02593 | BRANDON P SMITH | 9/5/2019 | |||||||
BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE vs BRANDON P SMITH | |||||||||
19CVI03172 | FINAL TOUCH BODYSHOP | 9/5/2019 | |||||||
STEVEN A GOLSON Jr. vs FINAL TOUCH BODYSHOP | |||||||||
19CVE02106 | ROXANNA A DIAZ | 9/4/2019 | |||||||
CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY vs ROXANNA A DIAZ | |||||||||
19CVF03186 | TRISHA MOORE | 9/4/2019 | |||||||
HS FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC vs TRISHA MOORE | |||||||||
19CVF03054 | BRANDON M BOLLING | 9/4/2019 | |||||||
EAGLE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC vs BRANDON M BOLLING | |||||||||
19CVF02978 | ROBERT J CARDER | 9/4/2019 | |||||||
UNIVERSAL 1 CREDIT UNION INC vs ROBERT J CARDER | |||||||||
19CVF02923 | ANGELA PARRETT | 9/4/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, L vs ANGELA PARRETT | |||||||||
19CVF02498 | CASSANDRA WHEATCROFT | 9/4/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LL vs CASSANDRA WHEATCROFT | |||||||||
19CVF02411 | THOMAS TALBERT | 9/3/2019 | |||||||
CITIBANK, N.A. vs THOMAS TALBERT | |||||||||
19CVF02557 | BRENDA J SPRADLIN | 9/3/2019 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. vs BRENDA J SPRADLIN | |||||||||
19CVF02594 | EILEEN J CASTOR | 9/3/2019 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC vs EILEEN J CASTOR | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 234, 235, 236 ... 501, 502, 503 Next |