10122 Cases | Kettering Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
19CVF03538 | CHARLES HELTON | 10/4/2019 | |||||||
CBCS vs CHARLES HELTON | |||||||||
19CVF02241 | SHEILA YOCUM | 10/3/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs SHEILA YOCUM | |||||||||
19CVF02398 | JAMES YUHASZ | 10/3/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs JAMES YUHASZ | |||||||||
19CVF02771 | ANGELA K SPROUSE - UNDERWOOD | 10/3/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs ANGELA K SPROUSE - UNDERWOOD | |||||||||
19CVF03428 | SANDRA D COLLINS | 10/3/2019 | |||||||
PATHFINDER REALTY, INC vs SANDRA D COLLINS | |||||||||
19CVF02847 | ANGELA MILLER | 10/2/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs ANGELA MILLER | |||||||||
19CVF03154 | GLENNA REESE | 10/2/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs GLENNA REESE | |||||||||
19CVF03050 | QUYEN LUU | 10/2/2019 | |||||||
AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK vs QUYEN LUU | |||||||||
19CVF02635 | ANNETTE M SALYER | 10/2/2019 | |||||||
CITIBANK, N.A. vs ANNETTE M SALYER | |||||||||
19CVF02633 | JACY D MCCAIN | 10/2/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs JACY D MCCAIN | |||||||||
19CVF02625 | DOMINIQUE K TEMKE | 10/2/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, L vs DOMINIQUE K TEMKE | |||||||||
19CVF02561 | CHERYL LABENSKY | 10/2/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs CHERYL LABENSKY | |||||||||
19CVF02485 | TODD MARSHALL | 10/2/2019 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC vs TODD MARSHALL | |||||||||
18CVF03898 | HISNI TRONI | 10/1/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs HISNI TRONI | |||||||||
19CVF02761 | LEAH M GEBERS | 10/1/2019 | |||||||
BANK OF AMERICA NA vs LEAH M GEBERS | |||||||||
19CVF03398 | LEIGH ARRIAGA | 10/1/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSN. LLC vs LEIGH ARRIAGA | |||||||||
19CVF03407 | KEVIN RAKES | 10/1/2019 | |||||||
YANKEE DENTAL vs KEVIN RAKES | |||||||||
19CVF03045 | NYKOLE EWING | 9/30/2019 | |||||||
CBCS vs NYKOLE EWING | |||||||||
18CVF03874 | AMANDA HILL | 9/27/2019 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs AMANDA HILL | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 233, 234, 235 ... 505, 506, 507 Next |