10122 Cases | Kettering Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
19CVI03564 | DAKOTA CHAFFINS | 10/29/2019 | |||||||
DON WRIGHT REALTY, LLC vs DAKOTA CHAFFINS | |||||||||
19CVG03208 | NELISSA DAVIS-FRYBARGER | 10/29/2019 | |||||||
VERNA L CRAWFORD vs NELISSA DAVIS-FRYBARGER | |||||||||
19CVF03163 | CRAIG R COLLINS | 10/28/2019 | |||||||
ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC vs CRAIG R COLLINS | |||||||||
19CVF03405 | TIFFANY A HEMBREE | 10/28/2019 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK c/o ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES, P.C. vs TIFFANY A HEMBREE | |||||||||
19CVG03265 | DIANA CHAMPAGNE | 10/28/2019 | |||||||
JEFF HARNING vs DIANA CHAMPAGNE | |||||||||
19CVI03325 | RICK DAVIS | 10/28/2019 | |||||||
WILLIAM RUSH vs RICK DAVIS | |||||||||
19CVF02324 | JESSICA TAYLOR | 10/25/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LL vs JESSICA TAYLOR | |||||||||
19CVF03008 | ANDREW L SCHAADE | 10/25/2019 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. vs ANDREW L SCHAADE | |||||||||
19CVF02997 | SHELBIE MOORE | 10/23/2019 | |||||||
CITIBANK NA vs SHELBIE MOORE | |||||||||
19CVF03372 | NATIVIDAD N DECASTRO | 10/23/2019 | |||||||
BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE vs NATIVIDAD N DECASTRO | |||||||||
19CVF03360 | AMY WILLIAMS | 10/23/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs AMY WILLIAMS | |||||||||
19CVF03266 | KENNETH E HISLE | 10/23/2019 | |||||||
ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS INVESTMENT ASSIGNEE OF FIRST NAT'L BANK OMA vs KENNETH E HI... | |||||||||
19CVF02814 | SHAWN WITHERELL | 10/23/2019 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs SHAWN WITHERELL | |||||||||
19CVF02011 | LUKE PHEANIS | 10/23/2019 | |||||||
CORNERSTONE-KETTERING PROPERTIES BEAVER RIDGE RUN APARTMENTS vs LUKE PHEANIS | |||||||||
19CVF03141 | DAVID SABROWSKI | 10/22/2019 | |||||||
ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC vs DAVID SABROWSKI | |||||||||
19CVF03541 | MARCIA J HATFIELD | 10/22/2019 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO INC vs MARCIA J HATFIELD | |||||||||
19CVF03436 | KINDRA BECK | 10/21/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs KINDRA BECK | |||||||||
19CVF02372 | KATHY HUGHES | 10/18/2019 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA C/O LYONS, DOUGHTY & VELDHUIS P. vs KATHY HUGHES | |||||||||
19CVF02514 | TOBY L SPIRE | 10/18/2019 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs TOBY L SPIRE | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 227, 228, 229 ... 505, 506, 507 Next |