Daily Law Journal
5147 Cases | Kettering Municipal Judgements
Case Number Defendant Date
16CVF02075 KEITH DAVIS 3/31/2016
CACH, LLC vs KEITH DAVIS
15CVF03077 JOEL WALKER 3/31/2016
CITY OF KETTERING vs JOEL WALKER
15CVF02595 DANA HOWERTON 3/30/2016
CITIBANK, N.A. SUCCESSOR TO CITIBANK (SOUTH DAK vs DANA HOWERTON
15CVF02891 THOMAS RICHIE 3/30/2016
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LL vs THOMAS RICHIE
16CVI02108 LATONYA E DILLON 3/29/2016
ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE SPECIAL FINANCE UNIT, LLC vs LATONYA E DILLON
15CVF02349 PATRICIA A GILMER 3/28/2016
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) NA vs PATRICIA A GILMER
15CVG02918 MARY HOWELL 3/25/2016
CORNERSTONE-KETTERING PROPERTIES, LTD vs MARY HOWELL

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... 219, 220, 221 ... 256, 257, 258  Next