10122 Cases | Kettering Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
19CVI03905 | AMANDA LAND | 12/12/2019 | |||||||
DON WRIGHT REALTY LLC vs AMANDA LAND | |||||||||
19CVF03400 | SAVOIE GARWOOD PROPERTY MAINTENANCE, LLC | 12/11/2019 | |||||||
CROWN PERSONNEL SERVICES, INC vs SAVOIE GARWOOD PROPERTY MAINTENANCE, LLC | |||||||||
19CVF03416 | JARA C GULASA | 12/11/2019 | |||||||
CBCS vs JARA C GULASA | |||||||||
19CVF03602 | ANTONIO J PEARSON | 12/11/2019 | |||||||
EAGLE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC vs ANTONIO J PEARSON | |||||||||
19CVF03095 | GAIL FULCOMER | 12/10/2019 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. vs GAIL FULCOMER | |||||||||
19CVF03287 | GARY WINTERBOTHAM | 12/10/2019 | |||||||
ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS INVESTMENTS ASSIGNEE/ FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF vs GARY WINTERBOTH... | |||||||||
19CVF04191 | SHERITA N JOHNSON | 12/10/2019 | |||||||
HS FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC vs SHERITA N JOHNSON | |||||||||
19CVI03686 | MELISSA E SAUNDERS | 12/10/2019 | |||||||
SUNDSTROM PROPERTIES vs MELISSA E SAUNDERS | |||||||||
19CVI03771 | NATASHA N FALL | 12/10/2019 | |||||||
JOHN P SANDERS Sr. vs NATASHA N FALL | |||||||||
19CVE04057 | KAREN FRAZIER | 12/9/2019 | |||||||
AVIS RENT A CAR SYSTEM, INC vs KAREN FRAZIER | |||||||||
19CVF04055 | KATHERINE M WAGNER | 12/9/2019 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK vs KATHERINE M WAGNER | |||||||||
19CVF03598 | WILLIAM WOLFE | 12/9/2019 | |||||||
MARINER FINANCE, LLC vs WILLIAM WOLFE | |||||||||
19CVF03540 | JEFFREY A MEHLBERTH | 12/9/2019 | |||||||
MARINER FINANCE LLC vs JEFFREY A MEHLBERTH | |||||||||
19CVF03089 | JESSICA RHINE | 12/9/2019 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs JESSICA RHINE | |||||||||
19CVF02408 | BMJ DISTRIBUTING INC | 12/9/2019 | |||||||
CAR TUNE USA, INC vs BMJ DISTRIBUTING INC | |||||||||
18CVF03871 | JOSHUA HERING | 12/6/2019 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I LLC BUYER vs JOSHUA HERING | |||||||||
19CVF04018 | JOHN D KARNS II | 12/6/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs JOHN D KARNS II | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 216, 217, 218 ... 505, 506, 507 Next |