Daily Law Journal
4820 Cases | Kettering Municipal Judgements
Case Number Defendant Date
15CVF02777 MICHAEL HOLIGA 1/11/2016
BUCKEYE CREDIT SOLUTIONS LLC vs MICHAEL HOLIGA
15CVF02361 SCOTT ARTZ 1/11/2016
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LL vs SCOTT ARTZ
15CVF02989 SHANNON L WELCH 1/11/2016
CBCS vs SHANNON L WELCH
15CVF02963 E SHEANSHANG 1/7/2016
UNIFUND CCR LLC vs E SHEANSHANG
15CVF02797 KIMBERLY HARDIE 1/6/2016
GREENMONT MUTUAL HOUSING CORP vs KIMBERLY HARDIE
15CVF03020 RICHARD HOYT 1/5/2016
CBCS vs RICHARD HOYT
15CVF02916 AMY M COLE 1/5/2016
CITY OF KETTERING vs AMY M COLE
15CVF02313 KRISTEN VANCE 12/31/2015
WESTERN RESERVE MUTUAL CASUALTY vs KRISTEN VANCE
15CVF02819 RICHARD KIMBLE 12/29/2015
JOSEPH CASHMAN vs RICHARD KIMBLE

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... 214, 215, 216 ... 239, 240, 241  Next