10106 Cases | Kettering Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
19CVF03643 | PAMELA CLARK | 1/6/2020 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs PAMELA CLARK | |||||||||
19CVF03645 | ROBERT THACKER | 1/6/2020 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs ROBERT THACKER | |||||||||
19CVF03717 | AMBER L BRETELSON | 1/6/2020 | |||||||
CITY OF KETTERING vs AMBER L BRETELSON | |||||||||
19CVF04088 | ROBERT W SMITH | 1/6/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC, LLC vs ROBERT W SMITH | |||||||||
19CVF03634 | APRYL D TOPIAH | 1/6/2020 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs APRYL D TOPIAH | |||||||||
19CVF03375 | KEVIN DARLING | 1/3/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LL vs KEVIN DARLING | |||||||||
19CVF03393 | RONALD L APPLIN | 1/3/2020 | |||||||
PATHFINDER REALTY, INC vs RONALD L APPLIN | |||||||||
19CVF03399 | AMANDA M NUNLEY | 1/3/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSN. LLC vs AMANDA M NUNLEY | |||||||||
19CVF03123 | MICHELLE WALLACE | 1/2/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs MICHELLE WALLACE | |||||||||
19CVF03975 | JAMIE L HAWKINS | 1/2/2020 | |||||||
CBCS vs JAMIE L HAWKINS | |||||||||
19CVF03908 | SEAN POLETE | 1/2/2020 | |||||||
SHERRETS LAW OFFICES, LLC vs SEAN POLETE | |||||||||
19CVF03586 | CINDY MICHAELSON | 1/2/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs CINDY MICHAELSON | |||||||||
19CVF03344 | BRYAN CORNELIUS | 1/2/2020 | |||||||
BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. vs BRYAN CORNELIUS | |||||||||
19CVF03270 | MICHAEL CATTRELLE | 1/2/2020 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs MICHAEL CATTRELLE | |||||||||
19CVF02699 | JESSE FELMING | 1/2/2020 | |||||||
CORNERSTONE-GOVERNOURS SQUARE, L vs JESSE FELMING | |||||||||
19CVE03687 | ALICIA BRYANT | 1/2/2020 | |||||||
CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY vs ALICIA BRYANT | |||||||||
19CVF03726 | ROBERT WILLHELM | 12/31/2019 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK c/o ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES, P.C. vs ROBERT WILLHELM | |||||||||
19CVF02559 | TREVAIL J TAYLOR | 12/30/2019 | |||||||
DAY AIR CREDIT UNION INC vs TREVAIL J TAYLOR | |||||||||
19CVF02722 | CORY SILLAMAN | 12/30/2019 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs CORY SILLAMAN | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 212, 213, 214 ... 504, 505, 506 Next |