10136 Cases | Kettering Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
19CVF03886 | TONY DIDONATO | 2/4/2020 | |||||||
CITIBANK NA vs TONY DIDONATO | |||||||||
19CVF03965 | JOSEPH YOUNG | 2/4/2020 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO INC vs JOSEPH YOUNG | |||||||||
19CVF03815 | NICHOLAS WEBB | 2/4/2020 | |||||||
FORSYTHE FINANCE, LLC vs NICHOLAS WEBB | |||||||||
19CVF02674 | GREGORY S IVEY | 2/3/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, L vs GREGORY S IVEY | |||||||||
19CVF02819 | LAURALYN GRAHAM | 2/3/2020 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK C/O ZWICKER & ASSOC, P.C. vs LAURALYN GRAHAM | |||||||||
19CVF03846 | PATRICIA A HANES | 2/3/2020 | |||||||
CBCS vs PATRICIA A HANES | |||||||||
19CVF03953 | AMY PARTON | 2/3/2020 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs AMY PARTON | |||||||||
19CVF04128 | TOCARRA HENLEY | 2/3/2020 | |||||||
CAPITAL AUTO CREDIT, LLC vs TOCARRA HENLEY | |||||||||
19CVF04159 | ALYSIA CVENGROS | 2/3/2020 | |||||||
CBCS vs ALYSIA CVENGROS | |||||||||
19CVF03124 | KENNETH SHEPHERD | 1/24/2020 | |||||||
FOX HUNT OWNER LLC vs KENNETH SHEPHERD | |||||||||
19CVI04091 | HANDY CHAMPS LLC | 1/24/2020 | |||||||
RYAN HAUSFELD vs HANDY CHAMPS LLC | |||||||||
19CVF02842 | AMANDA DEBONS | 1/24/2020 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs AMANDA DEBONS | |||||||||
19CVF04167 | TIMOTHY W TOMLIN | 1/22/2020 | |||||||
CAPTIAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs TIMOTHY W TOMLIN | |||||||||
19CVF02305 | BEVERLY CARLIN | 1/21/2020 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC vs BEVERLY CARLIN | |||||||||
19CVF03238 | CYNTHIA LEOPOLD | 1/21/2020 | |||||||
CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS, INC. vs CYNTHIA LEOPOLD | |||||||||
19CVF04045 | DAVID POWELL | 1/21/2020 | |||||||
AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK vs DAVID POWELL | |||||||||
19CVF04229 | JACOB GLENN | 1/21/2020 | |||||||
CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC vs JACOB GLENN | |||||||||
19CVF04239 | BRANDON MASSIE | 1/21/2020 | |||||||
BARCLAYS BANK DELAWARE vs BRANDON MASSIE | |||||||||
19CVF04368 | CHRISTY HOOPES | 1/21/2020 | |||||||
SECOND ROUND SUB LLC vs CHRISTY HOOPES | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 211, 212, 213 ... 505, 506, 507 Next |