10058 Cases | Kettering Municipal Judgements
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
19CVF03197 | NASTASSIA FULTZ | 2/18/2020 | |||||||
CORNERSTONE-KETTERING PROPERTIES BEAVER RIDGE RUN APARTMENTS vs NASTASSIA FULTZ | |||||||||
19CVF03239 | STANLEY C MEADORS | 2/18/2020 | |||||||
CITY OF KETTERING vs STANLEY C MEADORS | |||||||||
19CVF03463 | ANGLEA WILLIAMS | 2/18/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, L vs ANGLEA WILLIAMS | |||||||||
19CVF03573 | JAMES SHRADER | 2/18/2020 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs JAMES SHRADER | |||||||||
19CVF03691 | TRAVIS WILKINS JR. | 2/18/2020 | |||||||
CITY OF KETTERING vs TRAVIS WILKINS Jr. | |||||||||
19CVF03693 | WILLIAM M LEWIS | 2/18/2020 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs WILLIAM M LEWIS | |||||||||
19CVF03701 | AMBER L BRETELSON | 2/18/2020 | |||||||
CITY OF KETTERING vs AMBER L BRETELSON | |||||||||
19CVF04304 | JEREMY MCCOY | 2/14/2020 | |||||||
AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB vs JEREMY MCCOY | |||||||||
19CVF04408 | ALBERT CHAVEZ | 2/13/2020 | |||||||
CBCS vs ALBERT CHAVEZ | |||||||||
19CVF03236 | STEVEN R WILLIAMS | 2/12/2020 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA) N.A. vs STEVEN R WILLIAMS | |||||||||
19CVF04245 | JOSEPHINE F BAKER | 2/12/2020 | |||||||
ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC vs JOSEPHINE F BAKER | |||||||||
19CVF04070 | REBECCA BROWN | 2/12/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LL vs REBECCA BROWN | |||||||||
19CVF04059 | FADIA F KASSIS | 2/12/2020 | |||||||
UNIFUND CCR LLC vs FADIA F KASSIS | |||||||||
19CVF03924 | PAUL BARCUS | 2/12/2020 | |||||||
VELOCITY INVESTMENTS, LLC vs PAUL BARCUS | |||||||||
19CVF02620 | SHERRI VOLKERT | 2/11/2020 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs SHERRI VOLKERT | |||||||||
19CVF03273 | REBECCA HAWKINS | 2/11/2020 | |||||||
CORNERSTONE-KETTERING PROPERTIES BEAVER RIDGE RUN APARTMENTS vs REBECCA HAWKINS | |||||||||
19CVF03630 | THEODORE BRADFORD | 2/11/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs THEODORE BRADFORD | |||||||||
19CVF03835 | DAVID M FEDERICO | 2/11/2020 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs DAVID M FEDERICO | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 205, 206, 207 ... 501, 502, 503 Next |