15644 Cases | Kettering Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
20CVG02194 | MONICA MEYER | 2/18/2020 | |||||||
KETTERING RES, LLC vs MONICA MEYER | |||||||||
19CVE03656 | BRIAN GIBBONEY AND OHIO BUREAU OF WORKERS' COMPENS... | 2/18/2020 | |||||||
TEARLE S PIERCE Jr. vs BRIAN GIBBONEY and OHIO BUREAU OF WORKERS' COMPENS... | |||||||||
20CVI02001 | MASON STRALEY | 2/18/2020 | |||||||
BREANNA ELLIOTT vs MASON STRALEY | |||||||||
20CVI02011 | CHRIS R ALLDRED AND GARY JAMES | 2/18/2020 | |||||||
AWET TEKESTE vs CHRIS R ALLDRED and GARY JAMES | |||||||||
20CVI02016 | JEFF BENSON AND BENSON PROPERTIES | 2/18/2020 | |||||||
CHRISTINE ALLEN vs JEFF BENSON and BENSON PROPERTIES | |||||||||
20CVI02078 | MORGAN NEAL AND MATTHEW TIMMONS | 2/18/2020 | |||||||
DON WRIGHT REALTY, LLC vs MORGAN NEAL and MATTHEW TIMMONS | |||||||||
20CVI02031 | DOUG WAGNER | 2/18/2020 | |||||||
JOHN LIESER and CHERYL ARROYO vs DOUG WAGNER | |||||||||
20CVG02193 | JOHN SEGGERSON | 2/18/2020 | |||||||
KETTERING RES LLC vs JOHN SEGGERSON | |||||||||
19CVG02959 | RICK T FADER | 2/17/2020 | |||||||
LISA ANN BACK vs RICK T FADER | |||||||||
19CVF03573 | JAMES SHRADER | 2/17/2020 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs JAMES SHRADER | |||||||||
19CVF03693 | WILLIAM M LEWIS | 2/17/2020 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs WILLIAM M LEWIS | |||||||||
19CVF03768 | JUSTIN YOUNG | 2/17/2020 | |||||||
CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC vs JUSTIN YOUNG | |||||||||
19CVF04401 | TERRY LANIER | 2/14/2020 | |||||||
CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY vs TERRY LANIER | |||||||||
19CVF03786 | DESIREE D FLOWERS | 2/13/2020 | |||||||
BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. vs DESIREE D FLOWERS | |||||||||
19CVE01485 | CHRISTY DOTSON ANTHEM BLUE CROSS BLUE SHEILD | 2/12/2020 | |||||||
YOLANDA M. STEVENS-LENOIR vs CHRISTY DOTSON ANTHEM BLUE CROSS BLUE SHEILD | |||||||||
18CVF01973 | PATRICE CLARK | 2/11/2020 | |||||||
BGG EQUITIES, LLC vs PATRICE CLARK | |||||||||
18CVF01266 | HOOVEN - DAYTON CORP | 2/11/2020 | |||||||
ALCOR SUPPLY & FIXTURE CO vs HOOVEN - DAYTON CORP | |||||||||
17CVF02062 | STEVEN WELCH DBA WELCH'S JANITORIAL SERVICE | 2/11/2020 | |||||||
ALCOR SUPPLY & FIXTURE CO vs STEVEN WELCH DBA WELCH'S JANITORIAL SERVICE | |||||||||
20CVG00112 | LATASIA HOLT, AND ALL OTHERS | 2/11/2020 | |||||||
TOWNE PROPERTIES DBA INDIAN LOOKOUT APARTMENTS vs LaTASIA HOLT, AND ALL OTHERS | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 488, 489, 490 ... 781, 782, 783 Next |