15608 Cases | Kettering Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
20CVI02029 | MINNESOTA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY | 3/17/2020 | |||||||
RONALD G HELMS vs MINNESOTA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY | |||||||||
20CVI02080 | FGO LOGISTICS / JURGE RODRIGUEZ AND FGO / JURGE RO... | 3/17/2020 | |||||||
CAMERON WALKER vs FGO LOGISTICS / JURGE RODRIGUEZ and FGO / JURGE RO... | |||||||||
19CVF03669 | THOMAS WALTERS | 3/17/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LL vs THOMAS WALTERS | |||||||||
19CVF04185 | DOUGLAS CLARK | 3/17/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LL vs DOUGLAS CLARK | |||||||||
19CVF03991 | TERESA MCCLINTOCK | 3/17/2020 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs TERESA MCCLINTOCK | |||||||||
08CVF02478 | TONYA VAN METER | 3/17/2020 | |||||||
CREDIT INVESTMENTS INC vs TONYA VAN METER | |||||||||
20CVI02184 | LOVIE THOMPSON | 3/17/2020 | |||||||
TIARA WALKER vs LOVIE THOMPSON | |||||||||
19CVF04227 | CRAYMAN T WATKINS | 3/16/2020 | |||||||
CAPITAL AUTO CREDIT, LLC vs CRAYMAN T WATKINS | |||||||||
19CVF04125 | PATRICK W SALAAM | 3/16/2020 | |||||||
CAPITAL AUTO CREDIT, LLC vs PATRICK W SALAAM | |||||||||
19CVF03814 | SARAH J COMBS | 3/16/2020 | |||||||
FORSYTHE FINANCE, LLC vs SARAH J COMBS | |||||||||
19CVF04095 | MARIA C BREHM | 3/16/2020 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO INC vs MARIA C BREHM | |||||||||
19CVF04015 | JENNIFER L PINNEY | 3/16/2020 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO INC vs JENNIFER L PINNEY | |||||||||
19CVF04273 | JESSICA BLIZZARD | 3/13/2020 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs JESSICA BLIZZARD | |||||||||
19CVG03627 | CORY YOUNG | 3/13/2020 | |||||||
TIAH DEAN vs CORY YOUNG | |||||||||
19CVF03418 | CAROL YOUNG | 3/13/2020 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs CAROL YOUNG | |||||||||
19CVG03907 | JASON KELLY | 3/12/2020 | |||||||
KATE SLONAKER vs JASON KELLY | |||||||||
19CVF03806 | JUDY L HUCKLEBERRY | 3/12/2020 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs JUDY L HUCKLEBERRY | |||||||||
19CVF03358 | JAMI DICKEY | 3/11/2020 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs JAMI DICKEY | |||||||||
19CVF02812 | KEVIN ALLEN | 3/11/2020 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs KEVIN ALLEN | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 474, 475, 476 ... 779, 780, 781 Next |