15670 Cases | Kettering Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
20CVI02149 | MUHANAD HAMED | 3/31/2020 | |||||||
HALEY-DUSA ENG & SUR GROUP vs MUHANAD HAMED | |||||||||
19CVF04259 | ANDREW TITUS | 3/31/2020 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs ANDREW TITUS | |||||||||
19CVF04013 | REBECCA KREILL | 3/30/2020 | |||||||
AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK vs REBECCA KREILL | |||||||||
19CVF04112 | JENNIFER M PENIX | 3/30/2020 | |||||||
PATHFINDER REALTY, INC vs JENNIFER M PENIX | |||||||||
19CVF03829 | SARAH GIBSON | 3/30/2020 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK C/O LYONS, DOUGHTY & VELDHUIS P. vs SARAH GIBSON | |||||||||
19CVF03832 | JESSICA L HUFF | 3/30/2020 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK C/O LYONS, DOUGHTY & VELDHUIS P. vs JESSICA L HUFF | |||||||||
19CVF04272 | CHRIS FINE | 3/30/2020 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs CHRIS FINE | |||||||||
19CVF04261 | KARA BAILEY | 3/30/2020 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs KARA BAILEY | |||||||||
19CVF03936 | JENNIFER A MOORE | 3/30/2020 | |||||||
ALLY FINANCIAL INC. vs JENNIFER A MOORE | |||||||||
19CVF04250 | JOSEPH WHITFORD | 3/27/2020 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC vs JOSEPH WHITFORD | |||||||||
19CVF03979 | WILLIAM P WOLFE | 3/27/2020 | |||||||
ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC vs WILLIAM P WOLFE | |||||||||
19CVE03757 | PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY | 3/27/2020 | |||||||
CHERYL OLYNYK vs PROGRESSIVE INSURANCE COMPANY | |||||||||
20CVI02150 | DAVID BURNAP | 3/26/2020 | |||||||
HALEY-DUSA ENG & SUR GROUP vs DAVID BURNAP | |||||||||
19CVI03929 | A PRIVATE PLACE LLC C/O MARY BETH LODGE AND EILEEN... | 3/26/2020 | |||||||
DEBBIE SPARKES vs A PRIVATE PLACE LLC C/O MARY BETH LODGE AND EILEEN... | |||||||||
19CVI04428 | SOUTH DAYTON AUTO & TRUCK | 3/26/2020 | |||||||
JULIE MAYNARD, INC vs SOUTH DAYTON AUTO & TRUCK | |||||||||
19CVI03851 | JIM JENT | 3/26/2020 | |||||||
TANIS BRAINERD AND ALICIA DONOVAN BRAINERD vs JIM JENT | |||||||||
19CVG02380 | TRISHA PAYTON | 3/25/2020 | |||||||
MARK MURDOCH vs TRISHA PAYTON | |||||||||
19CVF03837 | MCKINSEY BREWER | 3/25/2020 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs MCKINSEY BREWER | |||||||||
19CVF04003 | JERROD YOUNG | 3/25/2020 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DOING BUSINESS IN OHIO AS MIDLAN vs JERROD YOUNG | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 473, 474, 475 ... 782, 783, 784 Next |