15644 Cases | Kettering Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
20CVG02377 | CYNTHIA ROGERS | 5/12/2020 | |||||||
EDMUND MERSHAD vs CYNTHIA ROGERS | |||||||||
20CVG02374 | MAUREEN RICHARDSON & GREG RICHARDSON | 5/12/2020 | |||||||
TIKI ESTATES LLC vs MAUREEN RICHARDSON & GREG RICHARDSON | |||||||||
20CVI02406 | DENNIS NOBLE | 5/12/2020 | |||||||
ANTWONE BROWN vs DENNIS NOBLE | |||||||||
20CVI02080 | FGO LOGISTICS / JURGE RODRIGUEZ & FGO / JURGE RODR... | 5/12/2020 | |||||||
CAMERON WALKER vs FGO LOGISTICS / JURGE RODRIGUEZ & FGO / JURGE RODR... | |||||||||
20CVG02364 | SHANE WESLEY ISAACS & MARISSA WREN | 5/12/2020 | |||||||
BEVERLY WINKLER vs SHANE WESLEY ISAACS & MARISSA WREN | |||||||||
19CVF04013 | REBECCA KREILL | 5/11/2020 | |||||||
AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK vs REBECCA KREILL | |||||||||
19CVF03509 | MATTHEW JANDES & KASEY BREWER | 5/8/2020 | |||||||
DAN HOTZ & SUSAN ODELL-HOTZ vs MATTHEW JANDES & KASEY BREWER | |||||||||
20CVF02421 | SEBASTIAN BARBOSA | 5/8/2020 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs SEBASTIAN BARBOSA | |||||||||
20CVF02060 | DAVID KOCI | 5/7/2020 | |||||||
CBCS vs DAVID KOCI | |||||||||
20CVF02040 | ALICIA R CRAWFORD | 5/7/2020 | |||||||
CBCS vs ALICIA R CRAWFORD | |||||||||
20CVF02214 | HAPPY ASIAN MART | 5/6/2020 | |||||||
LUCKY 8 TRADING LLC vs HAPPY ASIAN MART | |||||||||
19CVF03661 | JEWELL LUCKETT | 5/5/2020 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs JEWELL LUCKETT | |||||||||
13CVF00317 | MICHAEL TRIMBLE | 5/5/2020 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs MICHAEL TRIMBLE | |||||||||
19CVF04204 | JAMI DICKEY | 5/5/2020 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC vs JAMI DICKEY | |||||||||
19CVF03657 | JEFFERY PHILLIPS | 5/5/2020 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC vs JEFFERY PHILLIPS | |||||||||
19CVF03859 | CHANTAL DUMPSON | 5/5/2020 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs CHANTAL DUMPSON | |||||||||
19CVF04421 | KIMBERLY A BAUER | 5/5/2020 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC vs KIMBERLY A BAUER | |||||||||
19CVI03802 | MATTHEW DEAN AND ROBIN DEAN | 5/5/2020 | |||||||
NORMAN SPEAKS and SHIRLE SPEAKS vs MATTHEW DEAN and ROBIN DEAN | |||||||||
12CVF02888 | ROCHELLE L ROBERTS | 5/1/2020 | |||||||
SANDY'S TOWING C/O RICHARD D. SCHILLING ESQ vs ROCHELLE L ROBERTS | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 465, 466, 467 ... 781, 782, 783 Next |