15670 Cases | Kettering Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
20CVI02149 | MUHANAD HAMED | 6/2/2020 | |||||||
HALEY-DUSA ENG & SUR GROUP vs MUHANAD HAMED | |||||||||
20CVF02214 | HAPPY ASIAN MART | 6/2/2020 | |||||||
LUCKY 8 TRADING LLC vs HAPPY ASIAN MART | |||||||||
19CVF03983 | ASHLEY MILLER | 6/1/2020 | |||||||
SECOND ROUND SUB, LLC vs ASHLEY MILLER | |||||||||
20CVF02021 | REBECCA A GENSON | 5/29/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC, LLC vs REBECCA A GENSON | |||||||||
20CVF02064 | MELISSA M CARTER | 5/27/2020 | |||||||
CBCS vs MELISSA M CARTER | |||||||||
20CVF02473 | MELINDA HOLLAND | 5/27/2020 | |||||||
CBCS vs MELINDA HOLLAND | |||||||||
20CVF02414 | LAUREN LETTS AND SHAUN ESTERKAMP AND KIMBERLY MOFF... | 5/27/2020 | |||||||
DOFTH PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC vs LAUREN LETTS and SHAUN ESTERKAMP and KIMBERLY MOFF..... | |||||||||
20CVF02204 | BRANDON K KNOWLES | 5/27/2020 | |||||||
CBCS vs BRANDON K KNOWLES | |||||||||
20CVF02045 | ANGELA M ELLIS | 5/27/2020 | |||||||
CBCS vs ANGELA M ELLIS | |||||||||
19CVF04308 | ERICA KAIN | 5/27/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LL vs ERICA KAIN | |||||||||
20CVF02430 | EMMANUEL WHITE AND SHAWNETTA L WHITE | 5/26/2020 | |||||||
TRACIR FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC vs EMMANUEL WHITE and SHAWNETTA L WHITE | |||||||||
19CVF04053 | MARCIA E ROHRBACK II | 5/26/2020 | |||||||
UNIFUND CCR, LLC vs MARCIA E ROHRBACK II | |||||||||
19CVF04178 | BRADLEY R STOLFA | 5/26/2020 | |||||||
FIFTH THIRD BANK AN OHIO BANKING CORPORATION vs BRADLEY R STOLFA | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 461, 462, 463 ... 782, 783, 784 Next |