15670 Cases | Kettering Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
20CVI02029 | MINNESOTA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY | 6/9/2020 | |||||||
RONALD G HELMS vs MINNESOTA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY | |||||||||
20CVF02664 | MIKEAL WARREN | 6/8/2020 | |||||||
MOREHEAD STATE UNIVERSITY vs MIKEAL WARREN | |||||||||
19CVF04344 | DENNIS ELDRIDGE | 6/8/2020 | |||||||
ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS INVESTMENTS ASSIGNEE OF WEBBANK vs DENNIS ELDRIDGE | |||||||||
19CVF03906 | ROGER FLEENOR | 6/8/2020 | |||||||
SYNCHRONY BANK vs ROGER FLEENOR | |||||||||
19CVI03923 | MAD RIVER APARTMENTS | 6/5/2020 | |||||||
SURESHKUMAR SUYAMBUNATHAN vs MAD RIVER APARTMENTS | |||||||||
19CVF02790 | JOHN LI | 6/5/2020 | |||||||
ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS INVESTMENTS ASSIGNEE OF US BANK vs JOHN LI | |||||||||
20CVI02078 | MORGAN NEAL AND MATTHEW TIMMONS | 6/4/2020 | |||||||
DON WRIGHT REALTY, LLC vs MORGAN NEAL and MATTHEW TIMMONS | |||||||||
19CVF03888 | ANTOINE ALLEN | 6/3/2020 | |||||||
INSIGHT CAPITAL LLC vs ANTOINE ALLEN | |||||||||
20CVI02299 | ANTHONY JAMES PAINTING AND ANTHONY JAMES JR. | 6/2/2020 | |||||||
WILLIAM SIEDLING vs ANTHONY JAMES PAINTING and ANTHONY JAMES Jr. | |||||||||
20CVI02292 | SHAWN M LONG AND LONG 11 DESIGN | 6/2/2020 | |||||||
JENNIFER B HURSEY vs SHAWN M LONG and LONG 11 DESIGN | |||||||||
20CVI02290 | ANTHONY JAMES PAINTING AND ANTHONY JAMES JR. AND | 6/2/2020 | |||||||
WILLIAM SIEDLING vs ANTHONY JAMES PAINTING and ANTHONY JAMES Jr. and | |||||||||
20CVI02184 | LOVIE THOMPSON | 6/2/2020 | |||||||
TIARA WALKER vs LOVIE THOMPSON | |||||||||
20CVI02076 | COURTNEY I BROWN | 6/2/2020 | |||||||
DWAYNE BROWN vs COURTNEY I BROWN | |||||||||
20CVG02651 | DARRELL JONES AND SUSAN COUCH AND BRIDGET POMPE AN... | 6/2/2020 | |||||||
GEM CITY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, LLC vs DARRELL JONES and SUSAN COUCH and BRIDGET POMPE ... | |||||||||
20CVG02649 | JEROME DENMARK AND TERRY ATCHISON | 6/2/2020 | |||||||
COSMO SAVINO vs JEROME DENMARK and TERRY ATCHISON | |||||||||
20CVG02648 | DAVID MARTIN | 6/2/2020 | |||||||
RE/MAX VICTORY KIMBERLY WATTERMANN vs DAVID MARTIN | |||||||||
20CVG02634 | PAUL BUDAK | 6/2/2020 | |||||||
NOLAN REAL ESTATE vs PAUL BUDAK | |||||||||
19CVF03731 | LISA BIEDERMAN | 6/2/2020 | |||||||
SYNCHRONY BANK vs LISA BIEDERMAN | |||||||||
20CVF02064 | MELISSA M CARTER | 6/2/2020 | |||||||
CBCS vs MELISSA M CARTER | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 460, 461, 462 ... 782, 783, 784 Next |