15644 Cases | Kettering Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
20CVI02335 | SEAN CONDRON AND MADDALYN FARMER | 6/9/2020 | |||||||
HAILEY GORDON vs SEAN CONDRON and MADDALYN FARMER | |||||||||
20CVI02338 | CHASE CRANMER AND CLASSIC PAINTING & FINISHING SVS | 6/9/2020 | |||||||
WILLIAM SIEDLING vs CHASE CRANMER and CLASSIC PAINTING & FINISHING SVS | |||||||||
20CVI02631 | ONEMAIN FINANCIAL | 6/9/2020 | |||||||
ROLAND CLARK vs ONEMAIN FINANCIAL | |||||||||
20CVI02029 | MINNESOTA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY | 6/9/2020 | |||||||
RONALD G HELMS vs MINNESOTA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY | |||||||||
20CVI02084 | MICHAEL MARSHALL AND UNITED CONSTRUCTION GROUP | 6/9/2020 | |||||||
ROBERT N STICHWEH vs MICHAEL MARSHALL and UNITED CONSTRUCTION GROUP | |||||||||
20CVF02664 | MIKEAL WARREN | 6/8/2020 | |||||||
MOREHEAD STATE UNIVERSITY vs MIKEAL WARREN | |||||||||
19CVF04344 | DENNIS ELDRIDGE | 6/8/2020 | |||||||
ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS INVESTMENTS ASSIGNEE OF WEBBANK vs DENNIS ELDRIDGE | |||||||||
19CVF03906 | ROGER FLEENOR | 6/8/2020 | |||||||
SYNCHRONY BANK vs ROGER FLEENOR | |||||||||
19CVI03923 | MAD RIVER APARTMENTS | 6/5/2020 | |||||||
SURESHKUMAR SUYAMBUNATHAN vs MAD RIVER APARTMENTS | |||||||||
19CVF02790 | JOHN LI | 6/5/2020 | |||||||
ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS INVESTMENTS ASSIGNEE OF US BANK vs JOHN LI | |||||||||
20CVI02078 | MORGAN NEAL AND MATTHEW TIMMONS | 6/4/2020 | |||||||
DON WRIGHT REALTY, LLC vs MORGAN NEAL and MATTHEW TIMMONS | |||||||||
19CVF03888 | ANTOINE ALLEN | 6/3/2020 | |||||||
INSIGHT CAPITAL LLC vs ANTOINE ALLEN | |||||||||
19CVF03682 | CLEANRIGHT, INC C/O ALLEN CLARK | 6/2/2020 | |||||||
ERICA DOING vs CLEANRIGHT, INC C/O ALLEN CLARK | |||||||||
20CVF02064 | MELISSA M CARTER | 6/2/2020 | |||||||
CBCS vs MELISSA M CARTER | |||||||||
19CVF03731 | LISA BIEDERMAN | 6/2/2020 | |||||||
SYNCHRONY BANK vs LISA BIEDERMAN | |||||||||
20CVG02634 | PAUL BUDAK | 6/2/2020 | |||||||
NOLAN REAL ESTATE vs PAUL BUDAK | |||||||||
20CVG02648 | DAVID MARTIN | 6/2/2020 | |||||||
RE/MAX VICTORY KIMBERLY WATTERMANN vs DAVID MARTIN | |||||||||
20CVG02649 | JEROME DENMARK AND TERRY ATCHISON | 6/2/2020 | |||||||
COSMO SAVINO vs JEROME DENMARK and TERRY ATCHISON | |||||||||
20CVG02651 | DARRELL JONES AND SUSAN COUCH AND BRIDGET POMPE AN... | 6/2/2020 | |||||||
GEM CITY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, LLC vs DARRELL JONES and SUSAN COUCH and BRIDGET POMPE ... | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 458, 459, 460 ... 781, 782, 783 Next |