15608 Cases | Kettering Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
20CVI02488 | DIANE M MESCHER | 8/4/2020 | |||||||
JULIE HECHT vs DIANE M MESCHER | |||||||||
20CVI02480 | MIKE COMBS & GRANITE DESIGNS | 8/4/2020 | |||||||
FAITH RIEBESELL ROTH vs MIKE COMBS & GRANITE DESIGNS | |||||||||
20CVG02889 | AYANNA NOBLE | 8/4/2020 | |||||||
COLDWELL BANKER HERITAGE PROPERT AGENT FOR COCAP, LLC vs AYANNA NOBLE | |||||||||
19CVF03661 | JEWELL LUCKETT | 8/3/2020 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs JEWELL LUCKETT | |||||||||
20CVF02197 | ZURICH NORTH AMERICA AKA ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE... | 8/3/2020 | |||||||
CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY vs ZURICH NORTH AMERICA AKA ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE... | |||||||||
20CVE02432 | ILETHIA B VENEY & ANGELA BOWERS | 7/31/2020 | |||||||
CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY vs ILETHIA B VENEY & ANGELA BOWERS | |||||||||
20CVF02511 | MARLA L DUKE | 7/31/2020 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK C/O LYONS, DOUGHTY & VELDHUIS P. vs MARLA L DUKE | |||||||||
20CVH02675 | CITY OF CENTERVILLE | 7/31/2020 | |||||||
DIANE M TARKANY vs CITY OF CENTERVILLE | |||||||||
20CVI02652 | JONATHAN PETRY | 7/30/2020 | |||||||
FRED JUDSON vs JONATHAN PETRY | |||||||||
20CVI02016 | JEFF BENSON & BENSON PROPERTIES | 7/30/2020 | |||||||
CHRISTINE ALLEN vs JEFF BENSON & BENSON PROPERTIES | |||||||||
20CVI02399 | ADAM UNGER | 7/30/2020 | |||||||
RCF PROPERTIES INC / ANJANETTE FRYE vs ADAM UNGER | |||||||||
20CVF02361 | EFREN GUTIERREZ BECER | 7/29/2020 | |||||||
DNF ASSOCIATES, LLC C/P SONNEK & GOLDBLATT, LTD vs EFREN GUTIERREZ BECER | |||||||||
20CVV00009 | BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | 7/29/2020 | |||||||
DAVID M GROOMS vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR | |||||||||
20CVF02777 | BUFFY CASSIDY | 7/28/2020 | |||||||
SECOND ROUND SUB LLC vs BUFFY CASSIDY | |||||||||
20CVF02549 | TIFFANY HULING | 7/28/2020 | |||||||
CBCS vs TIFFANY HULING | |||||||||
20CVF02338 | CHASE CRANMER AND CLASSIC PAINTING & FINISHING SVS | 7/28/2020 | |||||||
WILLIAM SIEDLING vs CHASE CRANMER and CLASSIC PAINTING & FINISHING SVS | |||||||||
20CVF02605 | TRACY E CHANNELL | 7/28/2020 | |||||||
ABSOLUTE RESOLUTIONS INVESTMENTS ASSIGNEE OF CITIBANK vs TRACY E CHANNELL | |||||||||
10CVF03609 | LANCE BAKER | 7/28/2020 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC DBA OHIO AS MIDLAND FUNDING DE L vs LANCE BAKER | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 445, 446, 447 ... 779, 780, 781 Next |