15608 Cases | Kettering Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
20CVI02813 | BOB ROSS BUICK GMC | 8/25/2020 | |||||||
BETTY REED vs BOB ROSS BUICK GMC | |||||||||
20CVI02850 | JUSTIN PHILLIPS | 8/25/2020 | |||||||
DAVID YEN & JYAYEE YEN vs JUSTIN PHILLIPS | |||||||||
20CVI02869 | LILLIAN REICHEL | 8/25/2020 | |||||||
YVONNE REICHEL vs LILLIAN REICHEL | |||||||||
20CVI02878 | MIAMI VALLEY RENTALS & JK REAL ESTATE GROUP LLC | 8/25/2020 | |||||||
JESSICA O'DONNELL & SCOTT O'DONNELL vs MIAMI VALLEY RENTALS & JK REAL ESTATE GROUP LL... | |||||||||
20CVI02084 | MICHAEL MARSHALL & UNITED CONSTRUCTION GROUP | 8/25/2020 | |||||||
ROBERT N STICHWEH vs MICHAEL MARSHALL & UNITED CONSTRUCTION GROUP | |||||||||
20CVI02894 | HUMANA HEALTH PLAN OF OHIO, INC C/O CORPORATION SE... | 8/25/2020 | |||||||
LAWRENCE W HENKE III vs HUMANA HEALTH PLAN OF OHIO, INC C/O CORPORATION SE... | |||||||||
20CVG02981 | CHRIS SANDERS & JESSICA GARRISON | 8/25/2020 | |||||||
YVONNE SHEARS vs CHRIS SANDERS & JESSICA GARRISON | |||||||||
20CVF02710 | USAA INSURANCE COMPANY | 8/24/2020 | |||||||
MICHAEL MCADAMS vs USAA INSURANCE COMPANY | |||||||||
20CVF02207 | RHONDA D CARTER-FORD | 8/21/2020 | |||||||
CITIBANK, N.A. vs RHONDA D CARTER-FORD | |||||||||
20CVI02737 | MADISON P RANDOLPH | 8/20/2020 | |||||||
BRADLEY FULLER vs MADISON P RANDOLPH | |||||||||
20CVF02338 | CHASE CRANMER & CLASSIC PAINTING & FINISHING SVS | 8/20/2020 | |||||||
WILLIAM SIEDLING vs CHASE CRANMER & CLASSIC PAINTING & FINISHING SVS | |||||||||
19CVG04142 | KRISTEN ROARK & CHRISTOPHER MCCUNE | 8/20/2020 | |||||||
THIRTY 43 BY THE GREENE vs KRISTEN ROARK & CHRISTOPHER MCCUNE | |||||||||
20CVF02413 | STEPHEN L NEWMAN III | 8/20/2020 | |||||||
HS FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC vs STEPHEN L NEWMAN III | |||||||||
20CVF02198 | ALICIA GIBSON | 8/20/2020 | |||||||
HS FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC vs ALICIA GIBSON | |||||||||
20CVF02197 | ZURICH NORTH AMERICA AKA ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE... | 8/20/2020 | |||||||
CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY vs ZURICH NORTH AMERICA AKA ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE... | |||||||||
10CVF03408 | OMAR SHAM | 8/18/2020 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs OMAR SHAM | |||||||||
20CVF02209 | WILLIAM A JOHNSON III | 8/18/2020 | |||||||
CITIBANK, N.A. vs WILLIAM A JOHNSON III | |||||||||
19CVG02870 | ANGIE STAPE AND KIEL GREENLEE | 8/18/2020 | |||||||
BLENHEIM MANAGEMENT SERVICES AGT FOR THE RESIDENZ vs ANGIE STAPE and KIEL GREENLEE | |||||||||
20CVF02843 | PATRICIA K ADAMS | 8/18/2020 | |||||||
ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC vs PATRICIA K ADAMS | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 442, 443, 444 ... 779, 780, 781 Next |