15670 Cases | Kettering Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
20CVG03390 | CALISHA WOOD | 11/10/2020 | |||||||
MIAMI VALLEY HOUSING OPPORTUNITIES, INC vs CALISHA WOOD | |||||||||
20CVG03391 | BRUCE SMITH | 11/10/2020 | |||||||
MIDWEST ACQUISITION & MGMT TEAM for Ted Greenwood vs BRUCE SMITH | |||||||||
20CVI02995 | CUSA SOCCER CLUB AND PATRICK JOSEPH KING | 11/10/2020 | |||||||
DAVID CARLOS vs CUSA SOCCER CLUB and PATRICK JOSEPH KING | |||||||||
20CVF02197 | ZURICH NORTH AMERICA AKA ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE... | 11/10/2020 | |||||||
CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY vs ZURICH NORTH AMERICA AKA ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE... | |||||||||
20CVG03389 | STEPHEN LILLY | 11/10/2020 | |||||||
PRINCETON MANAGEMENT LLC vs STEPHEN LILLY | |||||||||
20CVF02357 | ASHLEY D COLLINS FISHER | 11/9/2020 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs ASHLEY D COLLINS FISHER | |||||||||
20CVF02367 | JOHN C WILSON | 11/9/2020 | |||||||
VALLONE LAW OFFICES LPA vs JOHN C WILSON | |||||||||
20CVF03008 | AESHA DAWSON | 11/6/2020 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LL vs AESHA DAWSON | |||||||||
20CVF02734 | THELIA N BARKER | 11/6/2020 | |||||||
MERCHANTS ACCEPTANCE CORP vs THELIA N BARKER | |||||||||
19CVF04367 | MICHAEL ROBERE | 11/6/2020 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC vs MICHAEL ROBERE | |||||||||
20CVF02189 | MOLLIE OSTERHOLT | 11/6/2020 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC vs MOLLIE OSTERHOLT | |||||||||
20CVF02449 | CATHERINE W JACKSON | 11/6/2020 | |||||||
SECOND ROUND, LP vs CATHERINE W JACKSON | |||||||||
20CVF02893 | KIM SCREVEN | 11/6/2020 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC vs KIM SCREVEN | |||||||||
19CVF04119 | VADA L OBERLIN | 11/6/2020 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs VADA L OBERLIN | |||||||||
19CVF04161 | JENNIFER M CASSON | 11/6/2020 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. vs JENNIFER M CASSON | |||||||||
20CVF02895 | BROWNIES INDEPENDENT TRANSMISSIO | 11/5/2020 | |||||||
VERONICA CARUSO vs BROWNIES INDEPENDENT TRANSMISSIO | |||||||||
20CVF02208 | JUSTIN LUNEKE | 11/5/2020 | |||||||
ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC vs JUSTIN LUNEKE | |||||||||
20CVF03171 | PEI YANG | 11/4/2020 | |||||||
MICHAEL MCADAMS vs PEI YANG | |||||||||
20CVF02976 | EVAN MARINANGELI | 11/4/2020 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs EVAN MARINANGELI | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 424, 425, 426 ... 782, 783, 784 Next |