15608 Cases | Kettering Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
20CVF03115 | STEFANIE STEWART | 12/22/2020 | |||||||
THOMAS R SCHIFF vs STEFANIE STEWART | |||||||||
20CVI03448 | NEHDS LOGISTICS ET. AL AND NEHDS LOGISTICS ET. AL | 12/22/2020 | |||||||
DARREN DAVIS Jr. vs NEHDS LOGISTICS ET. AL and NEHDS LOGISTICS ET. AL | |||||||||
20CVI03452 | SHEILA CAMPBELL | 12/22/2020 | |||||||
ALLURE SALON, INC vs SHEILA CAMPBELL | |||||||||
20CVI03503 | KRISTINA COLE | 12/22/2020 | |||||||
DANIEL L GRAETER vs KRISTINA COLE | |||||||||
20CVG03545 | WILLIAM COMBS | 12/22/2020 | |||||||
GEM CITY MHP, LLC vs WILLIAM COMBS | |||||||||
20CVF03332 | PLASTIC WORLD RECYCLING, INC | 12/21/2020 | |||||||
THERMOPLASTIC TRADING, INC vs PLASTIC WORLD RECYCLING, INC | |||||||||
20CVF03087 | CAROL MAYER | 12/18/2020 | |||||||
THOMAS SCHIFF vs CAROL MAYER | |||||||||
20CVF02810 | SPENCER WALLINGFORD | 12/18/2020 | |||||||
THOMAS R SCHIFF vs SPENCER WALLINGFORD | |||||||||
20CVF03144 | MELINDA WILLIAMS | 12/17/2020 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs MELINDA WILLIAMS | |||||||||
20CVF03140 | HEATHER BURCHETT | 12/17/2020 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs HEATHER BURCHETT | |||||||||
20CVF03010 | BARBARA CURTIS | 12/17/2020 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs BARBARA CURTIS | |||||||||
20CVF02469 | BILL WHEELER | 12/16/2020 | |||||||
STATE FARM BANK vs BILL WHEELER | |||||||||
20CVF02647 | ANISON COLBERT (MINOR) | 12/16/2020 | |||||||
DAY AIR CREDIT UNION INC vs ANISON COLBERT (MINOR) | |||||||||
04CVF03521 | LORI A HALE-STUMP | 12/16/2020 | |||||||
BENEFICIAL OHIO INC vs LORI A HALE-STUMP | |||||||||
07CVF02361 | LATONIA M CARMACK | 12/16/2020 | |||||||
BENEFICIAL OHIO INC vs LATONIA M CARMACK | |||||||||
20CVF02012 | LEXI ESTEVEZ | 12/16/2020 | |||||||
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs LEXI ESTEVEZ | |||||||||
20CVF03111 | JUANITA SMITH | 12/16/2020 | |||||||
CVI SGP ACQUISITION TRUST vs JUANITA SMITH | |||||||||
20CVF03044 | KATHERINE ROY | 12/16/2020 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs KATHERINE ROY | |||||||||
20CVF02375 | CHAMPION WINDOW COMPANY OF DAYTON LLC AND CHRIS HE... | 12/16/2020 | |||||||
DANIREL BRUNO and JUDY BRUNO vs CHAMPION WINDOW COMPANY OF DAYTON LLC and CHRIS HE... | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 408, 409, 410 ... 779, 780, 781 Next |