15644 Cases | Kettering Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
20CVF02802 | JAY JOSHI | 1/18/2021 | |||||||
JHPDE FINANCE I, LLC. vs JAY JOSHI | |||||||||
20CVF03100 | ROBERT FAUN | 1/18/2021 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LL vs ROBERT FAUN | |||||||||
20CVF02375 | CHAMPION WINDOW COMPANY OF DAYTON LLC | 1/15/2021 | |||||||
DANIREL BRUNO vs CHAMPION WINDOW COMPANY OF DAYTON LLC | |||||||||
20CVF03715 | PAUL ELLIS DISHON | 1/14/2021 | |||||||
LANDMARK ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION vs PAUL ELLIS DISHON | |||||||||
20CVF03716 | EMMANUEL WHITE | 1/13/2021 | |||||||
LANDMARK ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION vs EMMANUEL WHITE | |||||||||
20CVF02328 | RUTH C MACKEY | 1/13/2021 | |||||||
BANK OF AMERICA NA vs RUTH C MACKEY | |||||||||
20CVF03304 | STEPHANIE RAKES | 1/13/2021 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs STEPHANIE RAKES | |||||||||
20CVF02219 | SAVANNAH HAMBY | 1/13/2021 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs SAVANNAH HAMBY | |||||||||
20CVF03447 | JESSICA L KERSEY | 1/13/2021 | |||||||
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO, INC vs JESSICA L KERSEY | |||||||||
20CVF02553 | ANDREW ZEIGLER | 1/13/2021 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I LLC C/O LEVY AND ASSOCIATES vs ANDREW ZEIGLER | |||||||||
20CVG03632 | SARAH J PROFITT | 1/12/2021 | |||||||
HIGHDALE LLC vs SARAH J PROFITT | |||||||||
10CVF03615 | GRAHAM H HAYES | 1/12/2021 | |||||||
RIVERWALK HOLDINGS, LTD vs GRAHAM H HAYES | |||||||||
20CVI03190 | LOIS ROSS | 1/12/2021 | |||||||
FAHIMEH PARI vs LOIS ROSS | |||||||||
20CVG03451 | JOSEPH ROBERT DINES AND JASON A PACK | 1/12/2021 | |||||||
THOMAS REAGAN vs JOSEPH ROBERT DINES and JASON A PACK | |||||||||
20CVG03387 | ASHLEY WILLIAMS AND TONIKA WILLIAMS | 1/12/2021 | |||||||
MIMG XXVIII HERITAGE SUB LLC vs ASHLEY WILLIAMS and TONIKA WILLIAMS | |||||||||
18CVF03524 | ALEX BELL DENTAL DANIEL COBB, DDS, LLC | 1/12/2021 | |||||||
DIANNE ADKINSON vs ALEX BELL DENTAL DANIEL COBB, DDS, LLC | |||||||||
20CVE03116 | DRAKE R GRIFFITHS AND HAL ROBERTS | 1/12/2021 | |||||||
SHELTER MUTUAL INS. CO. vs DRAKE R GRIFFITHS and HAL ROBERTS | |||||||||
20CVF02745 | NECHE CRAWFORD | 1/12/2021 | |||||||
FOX HUNT APARTMENTS vs NECHE CRAWFORD | |||||||||
20CVF02749 | ASHLEY GONZALES AND GRISEL GONZALES | 1/12/2021 | |||||||
CHIMNEYS OF OAK CREEK APARTMENTS vs ASHLEY GONZALES and GRISEL GONZALES | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 403, 404, 405 ... 781, 782, 783 Next |