15670 Cases | Kettering Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
21CVG02376 | ZACHARY MAJORS AND BRITTANY VERNON-SMITH | 3/30/2021 | |||||||
BRITTANY LANE and JARED LANE vs ZACHARY MAJORS and BRITTANY VERNON-SMITH | |||||||||
21CVG02379 | CRYSTAL L TOWNSEND AND TINA M TOWNSEND AND DAVID T... | 3/30/2021 | |||||||
DIX ROAD PROPERTY MANAGEMENT LLC vs CRYSTAL L TOWNSEND and TINA M TOWNSEND and DAVID ... | |||||||||
20CVI03586 | RUSTY W SPARKS | 3/30/2021 | |||||||
MIAMI VALLEY COLON & RECTAL SURGEONS, INC vs RUSTY W SPARKS | |||||||||
21CVI02272 | AT&T | 3/30/2021 | |||||||
JOHN LYMAN vs AT&T | |||||||||
21CVI02126 | AJS RENOVATING | 3/30/2021 | |||||||
RUCHI MEHTA and ASHISH MANTUI vs AJS RENOVATING | |||||||||
21CVI02143 | GERMAINE ASHLEY JACKSON | 3/30/2021 | |||||||
DANIEL SCOTT ESTLE and JENNIFER MARIE JEWETT vs GERMAINE ASHLEY JACKSON | |||||||||
18CVF03524 | ALEX BELL DENTAL DANIEL COBB, DDS, LLC | 3/30/2021 | |||||||
DIANNE ADKINSON vs ALEX BELL DENTAL DANIEL COBB, DDS, LLC | |||||||||
20CVE03116 | DRAKE R GRIFFITHS AND HAL ROBERTS | 3/30/2021 | |||||||
SHELTER MUTUAL INS. CO. vs DRAKE R GRIFFITHS and HAL ROBERTS | |||||||||
21CVG02366 | JAQUELINE ANNE MEADE | 3/30/2021 | |||||||
MOHAPATRA SABYASHACHI vs JAQUELINE ANNE MEADE | |||||||||
21CVF02082 | ROBERT HALEY IV | 3/29/2021 | |||||||
DAY AIR CREDIT UNION vs ROBERT HALEY IV | |||||||||
21CVI02084 | JUSTIN PHILLIPS | 3/27/2021 | |||||||
DAVID YEN and JYAYEE YEN vs JUSTIN PHILLIPS | |||||||||
20CVF02471 | TAYLOR JONES | 3/25/2021 | |||||||
CBCS vs TAYLOR JONES | |||||||||
20CVF02984 | GINA MCDOWELL | 3/25/2021 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC vs GINA MCDOWELL | |||||||||
21CVF02056 | NICOLE MYERS | 3/25/2021 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC vs NICOLE MYERS | |||||||||
20CVF03076 | DUANA TIMBERMAN | 3/25/2021 | |||||||
JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS, LLC vs DUANA TIMBERMAN | |||||||||
21CVF02102 | JASON BICKFORD | 3/25/2021 | |||||||
REVCO SOLUTIONS, INC vs JASON BICKFORD | |||||||||
21CVG02273 | DOREEN DAY | 3/24/2021 | |||||||
JONATHAN MURRAY vs DOREEN DAY | |||||||||
20CVF03645 | BRITTNEY COPENHAVER | 3/24/2021 | |||||||
REVCO SOLUTIONS INC vs BRITTNEY COPENHAVER | |||||||||
20CVF03477 | HAROLD MERCHANT | 3/24/2021 | |||||||
PATHFINDER REALTY, INC vs HAROLD MERCHANT | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 384, 385, 386 ... 782, 783, 784 Next |