15518 Cases | Kettering Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
20CVF03155 | TINA WISHON | 3/1/2021 | |||||||
CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC vs TINA WISHON | |||||||||
20CVF03152 | VELVET HAWKINS | 3/1/2021 | |||||||
CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC vs VELVET HAWKINS | |||||||||
20CVF02553 | ANDREW ZEIGLER | 2/26/2021 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I LLC C/O LEVY AND ASSOCIATES vs ANDREW ZEIGLER | |||||||||
20CVF02745 | NECHE CRAWFORD | 2/26/2021 | |||||||
FOX HUNT APARTMENTS vs NECHE CRAWFORD | |||||||||
20CVF03368 | JAMES WAGNER | 2/26/2021 | |||||||
SYNCHRONY BANK vs JAMES WAGNER | |||||||||
21CVF02103 | MCCLISH D LAVALLIER JR. | 2/25/2021 | |||||||
AUTOVEST LLC vs MCCLISH D LAVALLIER Jr. | |||||||||
20CVF02857 | ROSEMARY PETERS | 2/25/2021 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs ROSEMARY PETERS | |||||||||
20CVF03432 | CHELSEA JEFFRIES | 2/24/2021 | |||||||
CREATIVE IMAGES INSTITUTE OF COSMETOLOGY vs CHELSEA JEFFRIES | |||||||||
20CVF02453 | MELISSA KOWALSKI | 2/24/2021 | |||||||
RBC, INC vs MELISSA KOWALSKI | |||||||||
20CVF03646 | KRISTOPHER MOORE | 2/24/2021 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC vs KRISTOPHER MOORE | |||||||||
20CVF03285 | JAMES C GUYTON | 2/24/2021 | |||||||
CITIBANK, N.A. C/O PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY vs JAMES C GUYTON | |||||||||
20CVF03333 | LISA BIEDERMAN | 2/24/2021 | |||||||
DISCOVER BANK vs LISA BIEDERMAN | |||||||||
20CVF03407 | ASHLEY MOODY | 2/23/2021 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC C/O PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY vs ASHLEY MOODY | |||||||||
20CVF03146 | JESSICA ROLF | 2/23/2021 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs JESSICA ROLF | |||||||||
20CVF03020 | JENNIFER KOERPER | 2/23/2021 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs JENNIFER KOERPER | |||||||||
20CVF03027 | DARYL GIST | 2/23/2021 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs DARYL GIST | |||||||||
20CVF03416 | JON LINVILLE | 2/23/2021 | |||||||
LVNV FUNDING LLC C/O PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY vs JON LINVILLE | |||||||||
20CVF03026 | BRENDA JONES | 2/23/2021 | |||||||
UNIFUND CCR, LLC vs BRENDA JONES | |||||||||
20CVF02859 | PAUL COMBS | 2/23/2021 | |||||||
UNIFUND CCR, LLC vs PAUL COMBS | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 381, 382, 383 ... 774, 775, 776 Next |