Daily Law Journal
8083 Cases | Kettering Municipal Assignments
Case Number Defendant Date
17CVF02781 OLIVER DUSABE 10/9/2017
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs OLIVER DUSABE
17CVF02606 DOUGLAS CARMAN 10/9/2017
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOC., LLC vs DOUGLAS CARMAN
17CVF02993 LAURA FOWLER 10/9/2017
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs LAURA FOWLER
17CVF02858 CALEB F HAGAN 10/9/2017
TRIHEALTH INC C/O RACHEL J. MASON vs CALEB F HAGAN
17CVF02609 CHRISTOPHER D POWELL 10/9/2017
EAGLE LOAN COMPANY OF OHIO INC vs CHRISTOPHER D POWELL
16CVF02793 MICAH DILLON 10/6/2017
SYNCHRONY BANK vs MICAH DILLON
17CVF02286 TOSHIA R HANSEN 10/5/2017
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs TOSHIA R HANSEN
17CVF02955 KEVIN HOWARD 10/5/2017
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs KEVIN HOWARD
17CVF03015 DREW HAILE 10/5/2017
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs DREW HAILE
17CVG02973 MIKE ROSE 10/4/2017
PRESIDENTIAL VILLAS LLC vs MIKE ROSE
17CVE02557 KYLE KOHLBERG 10/3/2017
DAYTON POWER & LIGHT COMPANY vs KYLE KOHLBERG
17CVF02986 HANK J RABE AND EUSONG RABE 10/3/2017
JOSEPH GRIESHOP AND PAMELA MARIE THOMAS vs HANK J RABE AND EUSONG RABE
17CVF02270 STEPHEN HARNESS 10/3/2017
MEDVET MEDVET ASSOCIATES INC vs STEPHEN HARNESS
17CVF02232 BEST AROUND HANDYMAN LLC AND JOE MILLER AND SAHM M... 10/3/2017
DANIEL HULS vs BEST AROUND HANDYMAN LLC AND JOE MILLER AND SAHM M...
17CVG03039 JASSON HENDERSON AND AMI HODGE 10/3/2017
CORNERSTONE-KETTERING PROPERTIES LTD vs JASSON HENDERSON AND AMI HODGE
17CVF02597 DANIELLE M ROTHWELL 10/3/2017
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION vs DANIELLE M ROTHWELL
17CVF02391 CARMELA SWIGER 10/3/2017
SYNCHRONY BANK vs CARMELA SWIGER
17CVG03334 MERCEDES LEWIS 10/3/2017
VAN BUREN VILLAGE ASSOCIATES vs MERCEDES LEWIS
17CVG03322 LINDSAY A DUVALL AND JOSH W RYAN 10/3/2017
CHEVY CHASE PARK APARTMENTS vs LINDSAY A DUVALL AND JOSH W RYAN

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... 364, 365, 366 ... 403, 404, 405  Next