15670 Cases | Kettering Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
21CVI02126 | AJS RENOVATING | 5/4/2021 | |||||||
RUCHI MEHTA & ASHISH MANTUI vs AJS RENOVATING | |||||||||
21CVI02466 | INDIA CHAAT | 5/4/2021 | |||||||
KC SERVICES LLC vs INDIA CHAAT | |||||||||
21CVG02376 | ZACHARY MAJORS & BRITTANY VERNON-SMITH | 5/3/2021 | |||||||
BRITTANY LANE & JARED LANE vs ZACHARY MAJORS & BRITTANY VERNON-SMITH | |||||||||
20CVF03546 | DALE MASSIE | 5/3/2021 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, L vs DALE MASSIE | |||||||||
21CVF02264 | NICHOLAS SHORT | 4/30/2021 | |||||||
HERITAGE HOME SERVICES LLC vs NICHOLAS SHORT | |||||||||
20CVF02065 | SHANDA L BAKER | 4/30/2021 | |||||||
CAPITAL AUTO CREDIT LLC vs SHANDA L BAKER | |||||||||
21CVF02105 | REX MALSON | 4/30/2021 | |||||||
AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK vs REX MALSON | |||||||||
21CVF02331 | BRENDAN SULLIVAN | 4/30/2021 | |||||||
MICHAEL A HOCHWALT vs BRENDAN SULLIVAN | |||||||||
20CVF03677 | TIANNA OLIVER & LAJUANE BROWN | 4/30/2021 | |||||||
FOX HUNT APARTMENTS vs TIANNA OLIVER & LAJUANE BROWN | |||||||||
20CVF03704 | DONALD R CHERRY | 4/29/2021 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC C/O LEVY AND ASSOCIATES, LLC vs DONALD R CHERRY | |||||||||
21CVG02433 | JODI ANN DIXON | 4/29/2021 | |||||||
LUTHMAN INVESTMENT PROPERTIES vs JODI ANN DIXON | |||||||||
21CVF02199 | MELISSA Y CUNNINGHAM | 4/29/2021 | |||||||
PATHFINDER REALTY INC vs MELISSA Y CUNNINGHAM | |||||||||
20CVF03519 | DARRIN RICHARDS | 4/29/2021 | |||||||
ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC C/O LEVY & ASSOCIATES, LLC vs DARRIN RICHARDS | |||||||||
20CVF03697 | JERIKA L WITT | 4/29/2021 | |||||||
CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC vs JERIKA L WITT | |||||||||
20CVF03690 | MARY DALTON | 4/29/2021 | |||||||
CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC vs MARY DALTON | |||||||||
20CVF03692 | KRYSTAL E BROWNING | 4/29/2021 | |||||||
CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC vs KRYSTAL E BROWNING | |||||||||
20CVE02992 | JAYDA RENEE HUBBARD | 4/29/2021 | |||||||
PROGRESSIVE DIRECT INSURANCE COM vs JAYDA RENEE HUBBARD | |||||||||
20CVF02899 | REBECCA BROWN | 4/28/2021 | |||||||
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES L vs REBECCA BROWN | |||||||||
20CVF02447 | JOSEPH HOWERTON | 4/28/2021 | |||||||
SECOND ROUND, LP vs JOSEPH HOWERTON | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 360, 361, 362 ... 782, 783, 784 Next |