Daily Law Journal
7433 Cases | Kettering Municipal Assignments
Case Number Defendant Date
16CVI02911 TAMELA HIGGINS 12/6/2016
BROWNIES INDEPENDENT TRANSMISSION vs TAMELA HIGGINS
16CVI02858 JAMES MIRACLE 12/6/2016
STEPHEN A WEEBER vs JAMES MIRACLE
16CVI02901 J.E.COM 12/6/2016
MOHAMED HENNAOUI vs J.E.COM
16CVI02943 BILL GILLUM 12/6/2016
RECECCA S MATHENY vs BILL GILLUM
16CVI02930 INNOVATIVE AUCTIONS 12/6/2016
BRENDAN SULLIVAN vs INNOVATIVE AUCTIONS
16CVI03000 SOUTHBRIDGE PROPERTIES 12/6/2016
LONNIE JAY BIGGS vs SOUTHBRIDGE PROPERTIES
16CVV00142 REGISTRAR BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICL 12/5/2016
THOMAS J JENNINGS vs REGISTRAR BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICL
16CVV00153 BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR 12/1/2016
MARY ODONOGHUE vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR
16CVI02149 ASHLEY MENZ JEREMIAH MENZ 11/30/2016
WENZLER DAY LEARNING CENTER, INC vs ASHLEY MENZ JEREMIAH MENZ
16CVI02144 AMY COLE 11/30/2016
WENZLER DAY LEARNING CENTER INC vs AMY COLE
16CVG03015 DEBRA HARRISON 11/29/2016
ITALIAN GREEK INVESTMENTS LLC vs DEBRA HARRISON
16CVG03011 ROSHANDA ROBERTS 11/29/2016
ALPHA RENTALS, LLC vs ROSHANDA ROBERTS
16CVF02749 BOBBY A THOMAS 11/29/2016
UC HEALTH, LLC vs BOBBY A THOMAS
16CVI02927 RIAN I THOMAS 11/29/2016
MIAMI VALLEY COLON & RECTAL SURGEONS vs RIAN I THOMAS
15CVF02712 JEFF SUTHERLAND SUTHERLAND HOMES LTD 11/29/2016
R K ASSOCIATES LLC vs JEFF SUTHERLAND SUTHERLAND HOMES LTD
15CVF02711 SUTHERLAND HOMES LTD 11/29/2016
FICKERT DEVCO INC vs SUTHERLAND HOMES LTD
16CVF02833 CHEEK LAW OFFICES 471 E BROAD STREET 11/29/2016
MARK THOMPSON vs CHEEK LAW OFFICES 471 E BROAD STREET

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... 354, 355, 356 ... 370, 371, 372  Next