Daily Law Journal
7895 Cases | Kettering Municipal Assignments
Case Number Defendant Date
17CVG02704 MINDY SMITH 8/29/2017
SHAOJUN WANG vs MINDY SMITH
17CVI02786 NARVELLA HICKS 8/29/2017
FUNK LAB DANCE & CREATIVE ARTS C vs NARVELLA HICKS
17CVI02966 STEVEN MICHAEL BRANNON 8/29/2017
NICHOLAS EVERT vs STEVEN MICHAEL BRANNON
17CVV00063 BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR 8/28/2017
BRIAN LEAMING vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR
17CVF02819 JEFFREY V ATHERTON 8/25/2017
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs JEFFREY V ATHERTON
17CVF02822 LEA ABPLANALP AND JAMES J SMITH 8/25/2017
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC vs LEA ABPLANALP and JAMES J SMITH
17CVF02946 CHARMAINE MOSTELLER 8/25/2017
DAY AIR CREDIT UNION vs CHARMAINE MOSTELLER
17CVV00080 OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR 8/25/2017
JACQUELINE HOWARD vs OHIO BUREAU OF MOTOR
17CVV00085 BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR 8/25/2017
CHRISTOPHER J BAILEY vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR
17CVF02617 RANDY MOUNT 8/25/2017
ANTHONY GRIMES vs RANDY MOUNT
17CVF02486 MOHAMED GULA AND TAHA GULA 8/24/2017
CHIMNEY'S OF OAK CREEK APARTMENTS vs MOHAMED GULA and TAHA GULA
17CVV00072 BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR 8/24/2017
JENNIFER GOODING vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR
15CVF02250 JONATHAN STOUT 8/22/2017
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LL vs JONATHAN STOUT
15CVF02622 PRISCILLA DAVID 8/22/2017
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LL vs PRISCILLA DAVID
15CVF02048 ERIC J BUCHANAN 8/22/2017
PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LL vs ERIC J BUCHANAN
17CVE02599 NORFOLK SOUTHERN CORP. 8/22/2017
MICHAEL LEIS and MOTORISTS MUT. INS. CO. vs NORFOLK SOUTHERN CORP.
17CVF02922 ROGER L WHITFORD 8/22/2017
DAY AIR CREDIT UNION vs ROGER L WHITFORD
17CVF02767 DANIELLE PARTENACH 8/22/2017
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs DANIELLE PARTENACH
17CVF02755 LEXUS OF DAYTON 8/22/2017
JAMES BALDWIN vs LEXUS OF DAYTON

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... 353, 354, 355 ... 393, 394, 395  Next