15644 Cases | Kettering Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
21CVI02937 | STANLEY D SHANK | 8/17/2021 | |||||||
CHRISTINE A HORSTMAN vs STANLEY D SHANK | |||||||||
21CVI02703 | AVERY C ASKINS SR. | 8/17/2021 | |||||||
LINDA M MERKER vs AVERY C ASKINS Sr. | |||||||||
20CVF03000 | JOHN EHLING | 8/16/2021 | |||||||
CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION vs JOHN EHLING | |||||||||
21CVF02824 | APRIL BAKER | 8/16/2021 | |||||||
SWEENEY RENTAL, LLC vs APRIL BAKER | |||||||||
20CVF03601 | DUSTYN BANKS | 8/12/2021 | |||||||
CHIMNEYS OF OAK CREEK APARTMENTS vs DUSTYN BANKS | |||||||||
20CVF03682 | LAURA COLUMBE | 8/11/2021 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC vs LAURA COLUMBE | |||||||||
21CVF02486 | ROEZETTA TRUE | 8/11/2021 | |||||||
VELOCITY INVESTMENTS LLC vs ROEZETTA TRUE | |||||||||
21CVF02453 | MARK FORTMAN | 8/11/2021 | |||||||
REVCO SOLUTIONS, INC vs MARK FORTMAN | |||||||||
21CVF02096 | LYNDON W COX | 8/11/2021 | |||||||
REVCO SOLUTIONS, INC vs LYNDON W COX | |||||||||
21CVF02812 | MELISSA ADKINS | 8/11/2021 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC vs MELISSA ADKINS | |||||||||
21CVF02647 | DONNA BROWN | 8/11/2021 | |||||||
CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC vs DONNA BROWN | |||||||||
21CVF02417 | STACY BRANHAM | 8/11/2021 | |||||||
CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC vs STACY BRANHAM | |||||||||
21CVF02613 | BARNEY HURST | 8/11/2021 | |||||||
CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC vs BARNEY HURST | |||||||||
21CVF02656 | MARK A FUND | 8/11/2021 | |||||||
CAVALRY SPV I, LLC C/O LEVY AND ASSOCIATES, LLC vs MARK A FUND | |||||||||
21CVF02651 | BONNIE M WRIGHT | 8/11/2021 | |||||||
CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC vs BONNIE M WRIGHT | |||||||||
21CVF02566 | AMANDA N KARRIP | 8/10/2021 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC vs AMANDA N KARRIP | |||||||||
21CVF02623 | MARK A COTTOM | 8/10/2021 | |||||||
ROGERS & GREENBERG, L.L.P. vs MARK A COTTOM | |||||||||
20CVF03552 | LAUREN E WILSON AND DANIEL M WILSON | 8/10/2021 | |||||||
NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2006 - 3 vs LAUREN E WILSON and DANIEL M WILSO... | |||||||||
21CVF02060 | KYLE DODSON | 8/10/2021 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC vs KYLE DODSON | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 327, 328, 329 ... 781, 782, 783 Next |