Daily Law Journal
7895 Cases | Kettering Municipal Assignments
Case Number Defendant Date
17CVF02698 WILLIAM QUINN 12/12/2017
LVNV FUNDING LLC vs WILLIAM QUINN
16CVI03105 AMBER COLLINS STEELE 12/12/2017
WENZLER DAY CARE & vs AMBER COLLINS STEELE
17CVG02923 MARCUS D COLEMAN INDEPENDENT CREATIONS LLC IND... 12/8/2017
MORAINE AIR PARK INC. vs MARCUS D COLEMAN INDEPENDENT CREATIONS LLC IND...
17CVV00067 BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR 12/8/2017
JERMAINE C MUKES vs BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES DON PETIT, REGISTRAR
17CVV00113 DON PETIT OHIO DEPT OF MOTOR VEHICLES 12/8/2017
TALMADGE COX vs DON PETIT OHIO DEPT OF MOTOR VEHICLES
17CVF02391 CARMELA SWIGER 12/7/2017
SYNCHRONY BANK vs CARMELA SWIGER
17CVV00116 DON PETIT OHIO DEPT OF MOTOR VEHICLES 12/7/2017
JOHN C ELLIS Jr. vs DON PETIT OHIO DEPT OF MOTOR VEHICLES
17CVV00109 DON PETIT OHIO DEPT OF MOTOR VEHICLES 12/7/2017
TERRY E BALTES vs DON PETIT OHIO DEPT OF MOTOR VEHICLES
16CVE02606 BRITTANY CROSSLEY 12/6/2017
CINCINNATI INSURANCE COMPANY vs BRITTANY CROSSLEY
17CVE02059 CHARLES P ROWLAND AND OHIO DEPARTMENT OF MEDICAID 12/6/2017
JAMES R SUMLIN vs CHARLES P ROWLAND and OHIO DEPARTMENT OF MEDICAID
17CVG03706 JOSH SINGER 12/5/2017
MILLBURN APTS OF DAYTON II vs JOSH SINGER
17CVG03705 ALEX LAVOIE 12/5/2017
VAN BUREN VILLAGE ASSOCIATES vs ALEX LAVOIE
17CVG03704 MARKAYLA BRADSHAW AND JAMES SUMLIN 12/5/2017
VAN BUREN VILLAGE ASSOCIATES vs MARKAYLA BRADSHAW and JAMES SUMLIN
17CVG03703 DAVID STONE AND THOMAS STONE 12/5/2017
VAN BUREN VILLAGE ASSOCIATES vs DAVID STONE and THOMAS STONE
17CVG03702 DEE CRUMBLE AND ANTWON WILLIS AND JAMES PIGHET III... 12/5/2017
VAN BUREN VILLAGE ASSOCIATES vs DEE CRUMBLE and ANTWON WILLIS and JAMES PIGHET III...
17CVG03693 PATRICK R SHARP 12/5/2017
DONALD R NORDSTROM vs PATRICK R SHARP
17CVG03687 HURST TOTAL HOME, INC 12/5/2017
948 FRANKLIN, LLC vs HURST TOTAL HOME, INC
17CVF02992 JUNE MONTEROLA 12/5/2017
MIDLAND FUNDING LLC vs JUNE MONTEROLA

Previous  1, 2, 3 ... 319, 320, 321 ... 393, 394, 395  Next