15670 Cases | Kettering Municipal Assignments
Case Number | Defendant | Date | |||||||
21CVI03318 | JERRY SIMPSON | 12/7/2021 | |||||||
OMAR AL SAMMARI and MOHAMMAD OMAR AL SAMMARI ( A MINOR) vs JERRY SIMPSON | |||||||||
21CVF03154 | GINA E MADZIA | 12/7/2021 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs GINA E MADZIA | |||||||||
21CVI03430 | SUITES AT WALNUT CREEK, LTD | 12/7/2021 | |||||||
JAMES D NEWTON vs SUITES AT WALNUT CREEK, LTD | |||||||||
21CVF02972 | LISA M KERVIN | 12/6/2021 | |||||||
REVCO SOLUTIONS INC vs LISA M KERVIN | |||||||||
20CVF03606 | JOSEPH M ANIGBOGU MD | 12/6/2021 | |||||||
OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY vs JOSEPH M ANIGBOGU MD | |||||||||
21CVF02411 | ISTECH MANUFACTURING LLC | 12/6/2021 | |||||||
MICHAEL D RODGERS Jr. vs ISTECH MANUFACTURING LLC | |||||||||
21CVF02467 | JENNIFER DAVIS | 12/3/2021 | |||||||
FORSYTHE FINANCE, LLC vs JENNIFER DAVIS | |||||||||
21CVF02982 | AMANDA MOORE MAY | 12/3/2021 | |||||||
BYRIDER FINANCE, LLC vs AMANDA MOORE MAY | |||||||||
21CVF02712 | GARY DASNER | 12/3/2021 | |||||||
GALAXY INTERNATIONAL PURCHASING, C/O SLOVIN & ASSOC., LPA vs GARY DASNER | |||||||||
21CVF03309 | DEBBIE A KINDER | 12/3/2021 | |||||||
BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. vs DEBBIE A KINDER | |||||||||
21CVI03428 | GORBY'S TRANSMISSION SERVICE LLC | 12/2/2021 | |||||||
RICHARD J HAMPO vs GORBY'S TRANSMISSION SERVICE LLC | |||||||||
21CVF02911 | GREG NEELY | 12/2/2021 | |||||||
CITIBANK NA vs GREG NEELY | |||||||||
21CVG03024 | FAS OUTDOORS CO & KYLE SAVOIE | 12/1/2021 | |||||||
ORTHO ADVANTAGE, LLC vs FAS OUTDOORS CO & KYLE SAVOIE | |||||||||
21CVF02802 | AMY GEMME | 12/1/2021 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. C/O LYONS, DOUGHTERY VELDHUIS, vs AMY GEMME | |||||||||
21CVF02371 | ALLEN CLARK | 12/1/2021 | |||||||
PARK A DOING & ERICA H DOING vs ALLEN CLARK | |||||||||
21CVF03226 | JOSEPH WILSON | 11/30/2021 | |||||||
BYRIDER FINANCE, LLC vs JOSEPH WILSON | |||||||||
21CVF03196 | JOSEPH HOWERTON | 11/30/2021 | |||||||
MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC vs JOSEPH HOWERTON | |||||||||
21CVF02959 | BONNIE C WRIGHT | 11/30/2021 | |||||||
CAPITAL ONE, N.A. vs BONNIE C WRIGHT | |||||||||
21CVF03016 | DANIEL RICE & RENEE D RICE | 11/30/2021 | |||||||
CITY OF KETTERING vs DANIEL RICE & RENEE D RICE | |||||||||
Previous 1, 2, 3 ... 299, 300, 301 ... 782, 783, 784 Next |